Silvia v. Mattiello et al
Plaintiff: David A. Silvia
Defendant: Representative Marvin Abney, Speaker of the House Mattiello and RI Attorney General
Case Number: 1:2019cv00298
Filed: May 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: Lincoln D Almond
Referring Judge: William E Smith
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 28:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 3, 2019 Filing 8 OBJECTION to #7 Report and Recommendations filed by David A. Silvia. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(Potter, Carrie)
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION FOR SUMMARY DISMISSAL PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. SECTION 1915(e) recommending DISMISSAL of #1 Complaint filed by David A. Silvia ( Objections to R&R due by 7/8/2019.), ORDER GRANTING #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by David A. Silvia, DENYING AS MOOT #6 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by David A. Silvia. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond on 6/24/2019. (Noel, Jeannine)
June 13, 2019 MOTIONS REFERRED: #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, #6 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis referred for determination to Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Urizandi, Nisshy)
June 5, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by David A. Silvia. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(Potter, Carrie)
June 4, 2019 Filing 5 MEMORANDUM to Forward Further Information by David A. Silvia in support of #1 Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(Potter, Carrie)
May 30, 2019 DOCKET NOTE: Regarding: #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis . The received IFP Motion was not signed by Mr. Silvia. Mr. Silvia was mailed an IFP form to be completed and returned to the Clerk's Office. (Potter, Carrie)
May 30, 2019 Filing 4 Letter sent to David Silvia returning previously received Summons and Six (6)UMS-285 Forms. (Attachments: #1 Returned Documents) (Potter, Carrie)
May 30, 2019 Filing 3 Pro Se Consent to Receive Documents Electronically filed by David A. Silvia. (Potter, Carrie)
May 30, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by David A. Silvia. (Potter, Carrie)
May 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, filed by David A. Silvia. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Envelope)(Potter, Carrie)
May 30, 2019 DOCKET NOTE: Regarding: #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis . The received IFP Motion was not signed by Mr. Silvia. Mr. Silvia was mailed an IFP form to be completed and returned to the Clerk's Office. (Potter, Carrie)
May 30, 2019 Filing 4 Letter sent to David Silvia returning previously received Summons and Six (6)UMS-285 Forms. (Attachments: #1 Returned Documents) (Potter, Carrie)
May 30, 2019 Filing 3 Pro Se Consent to Receive Documents Electronically filed by David A. Silvia. (Potter, Carrie)
May 30, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by David A. Silvia. (Potter, Carrie)
May 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, filed by David A. Silvia. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Envelope)(Potter, Carrie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Silvia v. Mattiello et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Representative Marvin Abney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Speaker of the House Mattiello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RI Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David A. Silvia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?