Southern Sky Renewable Energy, LLC v. Southern Sky Renewable Energy Rhode Island, LLC
Plaintiff: Southern Sky Renewable Energy, LLC, Francis X. McMahon and Anthony J. Delvicario
Defendant: Southern Sky Renewable Energy Rhode Island, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00300
Filed: May 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: Lincoln D Almond
Referring Judge: William E Smith
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 9, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by James G. Atchison on behalf of Southern Sky Renewable Energy Rhode Island, LLC (Atchison, James)
July 8, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by James G. Atchison on behalf of All Defendants (Atchison, James) Modified on 7/9/2019 (Potter, Carrie).
July 8, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Southern Sky Renewable Energy, LLC, Francis X. McMahon, Anthony J. Delvicario. Southern Sky Renewable Energy Rhode Island, LLC served on 7/8/2019, answer due 7/29/2019. (Corrente, Robert)
July 3, 2019 Filing 10 Summons Reissued as to Southern Sky Renewable Energy Rhode Island, LLC. (Potter, Carrie)
July 3, 2019 Filing 9 Summons Request filed by Anthony J. Delvicario, Francis X. McMahon, Southern Sky Renewable Energy, LLC. (Corrente, Robert)
July 3, 2019 Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Southern Sky Renewable Energy Rhode Island, LLC, filed by Southern Sky Renewable Energy, LLC, Francis X. McMahon, Anthony J. Delvicario.(Corrente, Robert)
June 19, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Carl A. Chiulli on behalf of Southern Sky Renewable Energy, LLC (Chiulli, Carl)
June 3, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher N. Dawson on behalf of Southern Sky Renewable Energy, LLC (Dawson, Christopher)
May 31, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Southern Sky Renewable Energy Rhode Island, LLC. (Potter, Carrie)
May 31, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Request filed by Southern Sky Renewable Energy, LLC. (Scott, Craig)
May 31, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Southern Sky Renewable Energy, LLC. (Scott, Craig)
May 30, 2019 Filing 2 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Potter, Carrie)
May 30, 2019 Case assigned to Chief Judge William E. Smith and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Potter, Carrie)
May 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1370642 ), filed by Southern Sky Renewable Energy, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Scott, Craig)
May 30, 2019 Filing 2 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Potter, Carrie)
May 30, 2019 Case assigned to Chief Judge William E. Smith and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Potter, Carrie)
May 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1370642 ), filed by Southern Sky Renewable Energy, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Scott, Craig)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Southern Sky Renewable Energy, LLC v. Southern Sky Renewable Energy Rhode Island, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southern Sky Renewable Energy Rhode Island, LLC
Represented By: James G. Atchison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Southern Sky Renewable Energy, LLC
Represented By: Ryan M. Gainor
Represented By: John O. Mancini
Represented By: Francis A. Connor, III
Represented By: Robert Clark Corrente
Represented By: Craig M. Scott
Represented By: Carl A. Chiulli
Represented By: Christopher N. Dawson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Francis X. McMahon
Represented By: Robert Clark Corrente
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony J. Delvicario
Represented By: Robert Clark Corrente
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?