Jenkins v. State of Rhode Island et al
Plaintiff: Gary V. Jenkins
Defendant: State of Rhode Island, City of East Providence and Local 850 IAFF, AFL-CIO
Case Number: 1:2019cv00312
Filed: June 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: Lincoln D Almond
Referring Judge: William E Smith
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:1981
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 23, 2019 Filing 8 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Gary V. Jenkins. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Potter, Carrie)
June 27, 2019 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Gary V. Jenkins. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Potter, Carrie)
June 25, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Subpoena Rhode Island Superior Court C.A. No. PM-2018-8786 Transcript dated June 25, 2019 filed by Gary V. Jenkins. Responses due by 7/9/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Potter, Carrie)
June 24, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Stay Rhode Island Superior Court CA No. PM-2018-8786 Pending Ruling From U.S. District Court, District of Rhode Island filed by Gary V. Jenkins. Responses due by 7/8/2019. (Potter, Carrie)
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Giving due deference to Plaintiff's pro se status, this Court will not recommend at this time that the District Court dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint under 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2)(B) due to the deficiencies identified above. Rather, Plaintiff is GRANTED leave to file an Amended Complaint within thirty days from the date of this Order that complies with the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure as discussed. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond on 6/21/2019. (Noel, Jeannine)
June 17, 2019 MOTIONS REFERRED: #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis referred for determination to Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Urizandi, Nisshy)
June 4, 2019 Filing 3 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Potter, Carrie)
June 4, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Gary V. Jenkins. (Potter, Carrie)
June 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, filed by Gary V. Jenkins. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Potter, Carrie)
June 4, 2019 Filing 3 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Potter, Carrie)
June 4, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Gary V. Jenkins. (Potter, Carrie)
June 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, filed by Gary V. Jenkins. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Potter, Carrie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jenkins v. State of Rhode Island et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Rhode Island
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of East Providence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Local 850 IAFF, AFL-CIO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary V. Jenkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?