Casey v. Manni et al
Plaintiff: Michael Casey
Defendant: Rhode Island State Police, Gerald McKinney, Joseph Philbin, James Manni and Dennis Fleming
Case Number: 1:2019cv00314
Filed: June 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: Lincoln D Almond
Referring Judge: John J McConnell
2 Judge: Patricia A Sullivan
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 2, 2019 Filing 17 Defendants' ANSWER to Complaint by Dennis Fleming, James Manni, Gerald McKinney, Joseph Philbin.(Shaw, Matthew)
August 2, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Natalya A. Buckler on behalf of Dennis Fleming, James Manni, Gerald McKinney, Joseph Philbin (Buckler, Natalya)
August 2, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Rebecca Tedford Partington on behalf of Dennis Fleming, James Manni, Gerald McKinney, Joseph Philbin (Partington, Rebecca)
August 2, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew I. Shaw on behalf of Dennis Fleming, James Manni, Gerald McKinney, Joseph Philbin (Shaw, Matthew)
July 12, 2019 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Michael Casey. Gerald McKinney served on 7/2/2019, answer due 8/2/2019. (Cass, David)
July 12, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Michael Casey. Dennis Fleming served on 7/2/2019, answer due 8/2/2019. (Cass, David)
July 12, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Michael Casey. Joseph Philbin served on 7/1/2019, answer due 8/2/2019. (Cass, David)
July 12, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Michael Casey. Gerald McKinney served on 6/19/2019, answer due 8/2/2019. (Cass, David)
July 12, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Michael Casey. Dennis Fleming served on 6/19/2019, answer due 8/2/2019. (Cass, David)
July 12, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Michael Casey. Joseph Philbin served on 6/19/2019, answer due 8/2/2019. (Cass, David)
July 12, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Michael Casey. James Manni served on 6/18/2019, answer due 8/2/2019. (Cass, David)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entering Stipulation (ECF No. #6 ). Defendants shall have up to and including 8/2/2019 to answer or file a responsive pleading to the Plaintiff's Complaint (ECF No. #1 ) - So Ordered by District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 7/3/2019. (Urizandi, Nisshy)
July 3, 2019 Filing 6 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint filed by All Defendants. (Partington, Rebecca)
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of John T. Martin. So Ordered by District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 7/1/2019. (Potter, Carrie)
July 1, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for John T. Martin to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 100.00, receipt number 0103-1390773 ) filed by Michael Casey. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Cass, David)
June 14, 2019 Summons Issued as to Dennis Fleming, James Manni, Gerald McKinney, Joseph Philbin. (Potter, Carrie)
June 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER OF RECUSAL entered. Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond recused. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan for all further referrals. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond on 6/7/2019. (Noel, Jeannine)
June 6, 2019 Filing 3 Civil Cover Sheet filed by All Plaintiffs. Regarding New Case: Corrective Docket Entry, #1 Complaint . (Cass, David)
June 6, 2019 Filing 2 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Potter, Carrie)
June 6, 2019 Case assigned to District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Potter, Carrie)
June 6, 2019 CORRECTIVE DOCKET ENTRY Regarding: #1 Complaint. This case has been electronically filed and processed, however, after a quality control review the following deficiencies were found: Civil Cover Sheet not attached. The filer is directed to file a Civil Cover Sheet within one day. (Potter, Carrie)
June 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1374061 ), filed by Michael Casey.(Cass, David)
June 6, 2019 Filing 3 Civil Cover Sheet filed by All Plaintiffs. Regarding New Case: Corrective Docket Entry, #1 Complaint . (Cass, David)
June 6, 2019 Filing 2 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Potter, Carrie)
June 6, 2019 Case assigned to District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Potter, Carrie)
June 6, 2019 CORRECTIVE DOCKET ENTRY Regarding: #1 Complaint. This case has been electronically filed and processed, however, after a quality control review the following deficiencies were found: Civil Cover Sheet not attached. The filer is directed to file a Civil Cover Sheet within one day. (Potter, Carrie)
June 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1374061 ), filed by Michael Casey.(Cass, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Casey v. Manni et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Casey
Represented By: David S. Cass
Represented By: John T. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rhode Island State Police
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gerald McKinney
Represented By: Natalya A. Buckler
Represented By: Matthew I. Shaw
Represented By: Rebecca Tedford Partington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Philbin
Represented By: Natalya A. Buckler
Represented By: Matthew I. Shaw
Represented By: Rebecca Tedford Partington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Manni
Represented By: Natalya A. Buckler
Represented By: Matthew I. Shaw
Represented By: Rebecca Tedford Partington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dennis Fleming
Represented By: Natalya A. Buckler
Represented By: Matthew I. Shaw
Represented By: Rebecca Tedford Partington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?