Adlife Marketing & Communications Co., Inc. v. Associated Grocers, Inc.

Plaintiff: Adlife Marketing & Communications Co., Inc.
Defendant: Associated Grocers, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00316
Filed: June 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: Lincoln D Almond
Referring Judge: John J McConnell
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:504
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 2, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entering #11 Stipulation to extend time; Reset Deadlines: Associated Grocers, Inc. answer due 9/4/2019 - So Ordered by District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 8/2/2019 (Barletta, Barbara)
August 1, 2019 Filing 11 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint, Requesting 30-day Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint filed by Associated Grocers, Inc.. (Techentin, Jeffrey)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entering Stipulation (ECF No. #10 ); Associated Grocers, Inc. shall have up to and including 8/5/2019 to file an answer of responsive pleading to the Plaintiff's Complaint (ECF No. #1 ) - So Ordered by District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 7/3/2019. (Urizandi, Nisshy)
July 3, 2019 Filing 10 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint, extending time to answer or otherwise respond up to and including August 5, 2019 filed by Associated Grocers, Inc.. (Techentin, Jeffrey)
July 3, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey K. Techentin on behalf of Associated Grocers, Inc. (Techentin, Jeffrey)
June 25, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Adlife Marketing & Communications Co., Inc. (Sarega, Naomi)
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Naomi M. Sarega ; granting #6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Ryan E. Carreon. So Ordered by District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 6/11/2019. (Potter, Carrie)
June 11, 2019 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Adlife Marketing & Communications Co., Inc.. (Muller, Chip)
June 11, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Ryan E. Carreon to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Plaintiff ( filing fee paid $ 100.00, receipt number 0103-1376213 ) filed by All Plaintiffs. (Muller, Chip)
June 11, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Naomi M. Sarega to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Plaintiff ( filing fee paid $ 100.00, receipt number 0103-1376193 ) filed by All Plaintiffs. (Muller, Chip)
June 7, 2019 Filing 4 AO FORM 121: REPORT on Filing or Determination of an Action Regarding a Copyright (Simoncelli, Michael)
June 7, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Associated Grocers, Inc. (Simoncelli, Michael)
June 7, 2019 Filing 2 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Simoncelli, Michael)
June 7, 2019 Case assigned to District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Simoncelli, Michael)
June 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1374958 ), filed by Adlife Marketing & Communications Co., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Civil Cover Sheet, #9 Supplement)(Muller, Chip)
June 7, 2019 Filing 4 AO FORM 121: REPORT on Filing or Determination of an Action Regarding a Copyright (Simoncelli, Michael)
June 7, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Associated Grocers, Inc. (Simoncelli, Michael)
June 7, 2019 Filing 2 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Simoncelli, Michael)
June 7, 2019 Case assigned to District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Simoncelli, Michael)
June 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1374958 ), filed by Adlife Marketing & Communications Co., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Civil Cover Sheet, #9 Supplement)(Muller, Chip)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Adlife Marketing & Communications Co., Inc. v. Associated Grocers, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adlife Marketing & Communications Co., Inc.
Represented By: Chip Muller
Represented By: Naomi M. Sarega
Represented By: Ryan E. Carreon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Associated Grocers, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey K. Techentin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?