Brown v. Newrez, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Donald H. Brown
Defendant: Bank of America Corporation, The Bank of New York Mellon Corporation, Newrez, LLC d/b/a Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing and Newrez, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00327
Filed: June 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: Lincoln D Almond
Referring Judge: John J McConnell
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 30, 2019 Reset Deadlines: Bank of America Corporation's answer or responsive pleading shall be due 30 days after plaintiff obtains successor counsel or enters his appearance pro se on 10/15/19; Answer due 11/15/2019 (Barletta, Barbara)
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER denying #14 MOTION to Deny Document to be Filed Under Seal. Any document filed under seal on this case will be available to any future attorneys of record for the parties - - So Ordered by District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 7/24/2019. (Barletta, Barbara)
July 24, 2019 Filing 15 Letter of Termination Dated 5/16/2019. by Donald H. Brown (Potter, Carrie)
July 24, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION to Deny Document to be Filed Under Seal filed by Donald H. Brown. Responses due by 8/7/2019. (Potter, Carrie)
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #13 Motion for Extension of Time; plaintiff shall have until 10/15/19 to obtain successor counsel or enter his appearance pro se or this case may be dismissed without prejudice - So Ordered by District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 7/15/2019 (Barletta, Barbara)
July 12, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for an Extension of Time 90 Days to Retain Counsel filed by Donald H. Brown. Responses due by 7/26/2019. (McGuire, Vickie)
July 11, 2019 HEARING CANCELLED: The telephonic rule 16 conference scheduled for Wednesday, July 17, 2019 is cancelled (Barletta, Barbara)
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #4 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Andrew R. Bilodeau terminated. The plaintiff shall obtain successor counsel or enter his appearance pro se within thirty (30) days of this case may be dismissed without prejudice - So Ordered by District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 7/11/2019. (Barletta, Barbara)
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #12 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of C. Charles Townsend. So Ordered by District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 7/11/2019. (Potter, Carrie)
July 11, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for C. Charles Townsend to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 100.00, receipt number 0103-1394347 ) filed by Newrez, LLC, The Bank of New York Mellon Corporation. (Attachments: #1 ECF Registration Sheet)(Stoehr, Steven)
July 2, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Justin J. Shireman on behalf of Bank of America Corporation (Shireman, Justin)
July 1, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE by Bank of America Corporation Substitution of Counsel (Shireman, Justin)
June 26, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Hearing: Telephonic Rule 16 Conference set for Wednesday, 7/17/2019 at 09:15 AM before District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. The Court will initiate the call. Counsel shall provide the Clerk with contact information if it differs from the docket sheet. (Barletta, Barbara)
June 20, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint by Newrez, LLC.(Potter, Carrie)
June 20, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint by The Bank of New York Mellon Corporation.(Potter, Carrie)
June 20, 2019 Filing 6 STATE COURT RECORD received electronically from the State of Rhode Island. (Potter, Carrie) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/20/2019: #1 Sealed State Court Documents) (Potter, Carrie).
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #5 Motion to Seal Document Previously Filed With the Court - So Ordered by District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 6/20/2019. (Barletta, Barbara)
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #3 Motion for Extension of Time; Reset Deadlines: Bank of America Corporation answer due 7/31/2019 - So Ordered by District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 6/19/2019. (Barletta, Barbara)
June 19, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Seal Document Previously Filed With the Court filed by Bilodeau Capalbo, LLC. Responses due by 7/3/2019. (Capalbo, Ryanna)
June 19, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for Plaintiff filed by Bilodeau Capalbo, LLC. Responses due by 7/3/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Capalbo, Ryanna)
June 18, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for an Extension of Time Extension of time to July 31, 2019 filed by Bank of America Corporation. Responses due by 7/2/2019. (Hagopian, Michael)
June 18, 2019 Filing 2 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Potter, Carrie)
June 18, 2019 Case assigned to District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Potter, Carrie)
June 17, 2019 Filing 1 NEW CASE/NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Newport County Superior Court, Case Number NC-2019-0057. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0103-1382500, filed by Newrez, LLC d/b/a Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing. (Attachments: #1 Amended Complaint, #2 State Notice of Removal, #3 Exhibit, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Stoehr, Steven)
June 17, 2019 Filing 1 NEW CASE/NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Newport County Superior Court, Case Number NC-2019-0057. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0103-1382500, filed by Newrez, LLC d/b/a Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing. (Attachments: #1 Amended Complaint, #2 State Notice of Removal, #3 Exhibit, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Stoehr, Steven)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown v. Newrez, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America Corporation
Represented By: Michael R. Hagopian
Represented By: Justin J. Shireman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Bank of New York Mellon Corporation
Represented By: C. Charles Townsend
Represented By: Steven M. Stoehr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Newrez, LLC d/b/a Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing
Represented By: Steven M. Stoehr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Newrez, LLC
Represented By: Steven M. Stoehr
Represented By: C. Charles Townsend
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald H. Brown
Represented By: Andrew R. Bilodeau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?