Narcisi v. Turtleboy Digital Marketing LLC
Plaintiff: Kathryn Narcisi
Defendant: Turtleboy Digital Marketing LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00329
Filed: June 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: John J McConnell
Referring Judge: Patricia A Sullivan
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER: Plaintiff's #7 Motion to Allow Time to File a Motion for Remand is GRANTED. Because the Plaintiff was without counsel for a period, the Court finds that exceptional circumstances and good cause exists to exercise its discretion and to extend the non-jurisdictional time limitation for filing a motion to remand - So Ordered by District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 8/6/2019 (Barletta, Barbara)
August 5, 2019 Filing 8 RESPONSE In Opposition to #7 MOTION for an Extension of Time Allow time to file Motion for Remand with supporting brief WITH SUPPORTING MEMO filed by All Defendants. Replies due by 8/12/2019. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Memorandum)(Labinger, Lynette)
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER vacating 8/5/19 Text Order granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to file a Motion to Remand; response to motion due 8/16/19 - So Ordered by District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 8/5/2019. (Barletta, Barbara)
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time for 45 days for plaintiff to file a Motion to Remand - - So Ordered by District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 8/5/2019. (Barletta, Barbara)
August 2, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for an Extension of Time Allow time to file Motion for Remand with supporting brief filed by All Plaintiffs. Responses due by 8/16/2019. (Pepe, Edward)
August 2, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Edward M. Pepe on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Pepe, Edward)
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER: Plaintiff is directed to obtain successor counsel or enter her appearance pro se within 30 days of the date of this Order or this case may be dismissed without prejudice. Plaintiff shall also respond to the #4 MOTION to Amend/Correct and #3 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction within 30 days of the date of this Order - So Ordered by District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 7/16/2019 (Barletta, Barbara)
July 16, 2019 Filing 5 STATE COURT RECORD received electronically from the State of Rhode Island. (Barletta, Barbara)
June 24, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Notice of Removal - New Case,, filed by All Defendants. Responses due by 7/8/2019. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Memorandum, #2 Exhibit Proposed Notice of Removal (Amended) with Exhibits A-D)(Labinger, Lynette)
June 24, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by All Defendants. Responses due by 7/8/2019. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Aidan Kearney and Exhibits 1-4 thereto, #2 Supporting Memorandum)(Labinger, Lynette)
June 18, 2019 Notice of Availability to Receive Documents Electronically. Pro Se litigants are encouraged to review the details of the Consent & Registration Form and if interested, complete the Registration Form and return it to the Clerks Office. Click # here to access the form. (Potter, Carrie)
June 18, 2019 Filing 2 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Potter, Carrie)
June 18, 2019 Case assigned to District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (Potter, Carrie)
June 18, 2019 Filing 1 NEW CASE/NOTICE OF REMOVAL of Narcisi v. Turtleboy Digital Marketing, LLC d/b/a Turtleboysports.com from Washington County Superior Court, Case Number WC-2019-0252. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0103-1383202, filed by Turtleboy Digital Marketing LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, Superior Court complaint, #2 Exhibit B, Superior Court Notice of Removal Filing, #3 Exhibit C, Superior Court Motion for Temporary Restraining Order, #4 Exhibit D, Superior Court Temporary Restraining Order entered May 16, 2019, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Labinger, Lynette)
June 18, 2019 Notice of Availability to Receive Documents Electronically. Pro Se litigants are encouraged to review the details of the Consent & Registration Form and if interested, complete the Registration Form and return it to the Clerks Office. Click # here to access the form. (Potter, Carrie)
June 18, 2019 Filing 2 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Potter, Carrie)
June 18, 2019 Case assigned to District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (Potter, Carrie)
June 18, 2019 Filing 1 NEW CASE/NOTICE OF REMOVAL of Narcisi v. Turtleboy Digital Marketing, LLC d/b/a Turtleboysports.com from Washington County Superior Court, Case Number WC-2019-0252. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0103-1383202, filed by Turtleboy Digital Marketing LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, Superior Court complaint, #2 Exhibit B, Superior Court Notice of Removal Filing, #3 Exhibit C, Superior Court Motion for Temporary Restraining Order, #4 Exhibit D, Superior Court Temporary Restraining Order entered May 16, 2019, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Labinger, Lynette)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Narcisi v. Turtleboy Digital Marketing LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathryn Narcisi
Represented By: Edward M. Pepe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Turtleboy Digital Marketing LLC
Represented By: Lynette J. Labinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?