Rossi Electric Co., Inc. v. Cutter Enterprises, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Rossi Electric Co., Inc. and United States of America
Defendant: Cutter Enterprises, LLC and Arch Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2019cv00330
Filed: June 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: William E Smith
Referring Judge: Patricia A Sullivan
Nature of Suit: Miller Act
Cause of Action: 40:270
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 15, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Cutter Enterprises, LLC. Responses due by 8/29/2019. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Memorandum, #2 Exhibit A to Supporting Memorandum)(Ramos, Adam)
August 15, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Arch Insurance Company. Responses due by 8/29/2019. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Memorandum, #2 Affidavit of Patrick Dwyer, #3 Exhibit Exhibits A-D to Dwyer Affidavit)(Ramos, Adam)
August 2, 2019 Reset Deadlines: Arch Insurance Company answer due 8/15/2019; Cutter Enterprises, LLC answer due 8/15/2019. (Jackson, Ryan)
August 2, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER Entering #8 Stipulation to Extend Time to Answer filed by Arch Insurance Company, Cutter Enterprises, LLC. So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 8/2/2019. (Jackson, Ryan)
July 12, 2019 Filing 8 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint - Extending Time to Respond filed by Arch Insurance Company, Cutter Enterprises, LLC. (Ramos, Adam)
July 9, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Adam M. Ramos on behalf of Arch Insurance Company, Cutter Enterprises, LLC (Ramos, Adam)
June 26, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Rossi Electric Co., Inc.. Cutter Enterprises, LLC served on 6/25/2019, answer due 7/16/2019. (Reale, Joseph)
June 26, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Rossi Electric Co., Inc.. Arch Insurance Company served on 6/25/2019, answer due 7/16/2019. (Reale, Joseph)
June 18, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Arch Insurance Company, Cutter Enterprises, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Potter, Carrie)
June 18, 2019 Case assigned to Chief Judge William E. Smith and Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (Potter, Carrie)
June 18, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Request filed by Rossi Electric Co., Inc.. (Reale, Joseph)
June 18, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Request filed by Rossi Electric Co., Inc.. (Reale, Joseph)
June 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1383474 ), filed by Rossi Electric Co., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Reale, Joseph)
June 18, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Arch Insurance Company, Cutter Enterprises, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Potter, Carrie)
June 18, 2019 Case assigned to Chief Judge William E. Smith and Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (Potter, Carrie)
June 18, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Request filed by Rossi Electric Co., Inc.. (Reale, Joseph)
June 18, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Request filed by Rossi Electric Co., Inc.. (Reale, Joseph)
June 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1383474 ), filed by Rossi Electric Co., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Reale, Joseph)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rossi Electric Co., Inc. v. Cutter Enterprises, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rossi Electric Co., Inc.
Represented By: Joseph J. Reale, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Joseph J. Reale, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cutter Enterprises, LLC
Represented By: Adam M. Ramos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arch Insurance Company
Represented By: Adam M. Ramos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?