Palange v. Forte
Plaintiff: Steven Palange
Defendant: Michael B. Forte, Courtney E. Hawkins, Jean Maggiacomo, Peter Neronha, Ronald Pagliarini, Margarita E. Palange, Sandra Lanni, Lois Iannone, Richard Updegrove and Tanya Gravel
Other: Deputy Clerk Jean Maggiacomo
Case Number: 1:2019cv00340
Filed: June 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: John J McConnell
Referring Judge: Patricia A Sullivan
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 16, 2019 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen M. Prignano on behalf of Margarita E. Palange (Prignano, Stephen)
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #26 Motion for Extension of Time; Reset Deadlines: Michael B. Forte answer due 8/30/2019 - So Ordered by District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 8/15/2019. (Urizandi, Nisshy)
August 14, 2019 Filing 26 MOTION for an Extension of Time extension of time filed by Michael B. Forte. Responses due by 8/28/2019. (Lyness, Sean)
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER: Plaintiff's Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order #22 is DENIED. The federal court lacks the authority under 42 U.S.C. 1983 to issue injunctive relief against judicial officers in this instance. Also, this request is barred by the Anti-Injunction Act, 28 U.S.C. 2283 - So Ordered by District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 8/14/2019. (Urizandi, Nisshy)
August 13, 2019 Filing 25 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Steven Palange. Courtney E. Hawkins served on 8/9/2019, answer due 8/30/2019; Sandra Lanni served on 8/9/2019, answer due 8/30/2019; Jean Maggiacomo served on 8/9/2019, answer due 8/30/2019; Peter Neronha served on 8/9/2019, answer due 8/30/2019; Ronald Pagliarini served on 8/9/2019, answer due 8/30/2019. (Attachments: #1 Return of Service, #2 Return of Service, #3 Return of Service, #4 Return of Service)(Simoncelli, Michael)
August 13, 2019 Filing 24 RESPONSE In Opposition to #22 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Michael B. Forte. Replies due by 8/20/2019. (Lyness, Sean)
August 12, 2019 Filing 23 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Steven Palange. Margarita E. Palange served on 8/8/2019, answer due 8/29/2019. (Simoncelli, Michael)
August 12, 2019 Filing 22 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Steven Palange. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit)(Simoncelli, Michael)
August 2, 2019 Filing 21 Pro Se Consent to Receive Documents Electronically filed by Steven Palange. (Simoncelli, Michael)
August 1, 2019 Filing 20 Summons Issued as to Michael B. Forte, Tanya Gravel, Courtney E. Hawkins, Lois Iannone, Sandra Lanni, Jean Maggiacomo, Peter Neronha, Ronald Pagliarini, Margarita E. Palange, Richard Updegrove. (Urizandi, Nisshy)
August 1, 2019 Filing 19 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Michael B. Forte, Margarita E. Palange, Sandra Lanni, Richard Updegrove, Tanya Gravel, Lois Iannone, Ronald Pagliarini, Peter Neronha, Jean Maggiacomo, Courtney E. Hawkins, filed by Steven Palange. (Attachments: #1 Exhbits to Amended Complaint)(Urizandi, Nisshy)
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER: Plaintiff Steven Palange filed a Motion to Amend #16 . Because of the liberal standards of Rule 15, the Court GRANTS his Motion. Because of the filing of an Amended Complaint, Defendants' Motion to Dismiss #11 is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Defendants' Motion to Stay Discovery #12 is GRANTED until the Court rules on an anticipated new Motion to Dismiss. Moreover, the Subpoena #13 issued to Jean Maggiacomo, Deputy Clerk of the Rhode Island Supreme Court is quashed - So Ordered by District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 8/1/2019. (Urizandi, Nisshy)
July 30, 2019 Filing 18 REDACTED PROPOSED AMENDED COMPLAINT by Steven Palange in support of #16 MOTION to Accept Verified Complaint for Violations of Constitutional and Civil Rights Seeking Injunctie and Declaratory Relief . (Potter, Carrie) Modified on 7/31/2019 (Urizandi, Nisshy).
July 29, 2019 Filing 17 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION to Subpoena by Jean Maggiacomo. (Attachments: #1 Subpoena)(Farrell Pletcher, Paula)
July 29, 2019 CORRECTIVE DOCKET ENTRY Regarding: #13 MOTION Objection to Subpoena . Document filed is an objection to subpoena and not a motion. Motion terminated from pending motions and document re-docketed. (Farrell Pletcher, Paula)
July 29, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION to Accept Verified Complaint for Violations of Constitutional and Civil Rights Seeking Injunctive and Declaratory Relief filed by Steven Palange. Responses due by 8/12/2019. (Attachments: #1 Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibits to Amended Complaint, #3 Summonses)(Potter, Carrie) CLERKS NOTE: Remote electronic access to the document has been restricted by the Clerks Office as it contains one or more personal identifiers (minor child's name and birth date). Filer is directed to submit a redacted version. (Attachment 3 replaced on 7/29/2019) (Potter, Carrie).
July 29, 2019 Filing 15 RESPONSE In Opposition to #11 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Steven Palange. Replies due by 8/5/2019. (Potter, Carrie)
July 29, 2019 Filing 14 RESPONSE In Opposition to #12 MOTION to Stay Discovery filed by Steven Palange. Replies due by 8/5/2019. (Potter, Carrie)
July 26, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION Objection to Subpoena filed by Jean Maggiacomo. Responses due by 8/9/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Subpoena)(Rocha, Tamera)
July 17, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Stay Discovery filed by Michael B. Forte. Responses due by 7/31/2019. (Lyness, Sean)
July 16, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Michael B. Forte. Responses due by 7/30/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Lyness, Sean)
July 16, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Justin Sullivan on behalf of Michael B. Forte (Lyness, Sean) Modified on 7/17/2019 to correct attorney name (Barletta, Barbara).
July 16, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Sean H. Lyness on behalf of Michael B. Forte (Lyness, Sean)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER: The Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction (ECF No. #6 ) is DENIED until the Defendant files a responsive pleading - So Ordered by District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 7/3/2019. (Urizandi, Nisshy)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEXT ORDER denying as premature and moot #7 MOTION for Invocation of Pendent Jurisdiction Over State of Rhode Island Laws and Claims - So Ordered by District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 7/3/2019. (Urizandi, Nisshy)
July 2, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Invocation of Pendent Jurisdiction Over State of Rhode Island Laws and Claims filed by Steven Palange. Responses due by 7/16/2019. (Potter, Carrie)
July 2, 2019 Filing 6 Emergency MOTION for Preliminary Injunction to Enforce the Constitutional Rights of Steven Palange and His Minor Daughter K.P. filed by Steven Palange. Responses due by 7/16/2019. (Potter, Carrie)
July 2, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Steven Palange. Michael B. Forte served on 6/25/2019, answer due 7/16/2019. (Potter, Carrie)
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER denying without prejudice #4 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. The Court cannot hear a Motion for Preliminary Injunction until all parties have been served and filed a response - So Ordered by District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 7/1/2019. (Urizandi, Nisshy)
July 1, 2019 Filing 4 Emergency MOTION for Preliminary Injunction to Enforce the Constitutional Rights of Steven Palange and His Minor Daughter K.P. filed by Steven Palange. Responses due by 7/15/2019. (Potter, Carrie) (Main Document 4 replaced on 7/1/2019) (Potter, Carrie).
June 20, 2019 Notice of Availability to Receive Documents Electronically. Pro Se litigants are encouraged to review the details of the Consent & Registration Form and if interested, complete the Registration Form and return it to the Clerks Office. Click # here to access the form. (Potter, Carrie)
June 20, 2019 Filing 3 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Potter, Carrie)
June 20, 2019 Summons Issued as to Michael B. Forte. (Potter, Carrie)
June 20, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Pro Se Appearance by Steven Palange (Potter, Carrie)
June 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00 receipt number 14670022377 ), filed by Steven Palange. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Receipt)(Potter, Carrie)
June 20, 2019 Notice of Availability to Receive Documents Electronically. Pro Se litigants are encouraged to review the details of the Consent & Registration Form and if interested, complete the Registration Form and return it to the Clerks Office. Click # here to access the form. (Potter, Carrie)
June 20, 2019 Filing 3 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Potter, Carrie)
June 20, 2019 Summons Issued as to Michael B. Forte. (Potter, Carrie)
June 20, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Pro Se Appearance by Steven Palange (Potter, Carrie)
June 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00 receipt number 14670022377 ), filed by Steven Palange. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Receipt)(Potter, Carrie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Palange v. Forte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Palange
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael B. Forte
Represented By: Sean H. Lyness
Represented By: Justin J. Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Courtney E. Hawkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jean Maggiacomo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter Neronha
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald Pagliarini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Margarita E. Palange
Represented By: Stephen M. Prignano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandra Lanni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lois Iannone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Updegrove
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tanya Gravel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Other: Deputy Clerk Jean Maggiacomo
Represented By: Tamera N. Rocha
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?