Veronneau v. HV Industries, Inc.
Plaintiff: Thomas A. Veronneau
Defendant: HV Industries, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00341
Filed: June 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: Lincoln D Almond
Referring Judge: John J McConnell
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 7, 2019 HEARING CANCELLED: The Telephonic Rule 16 conference scheduled for Thursday, 8/15/19 at 9:15 a.m. before Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. is cancelled (Barletta, Barbara)
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entering #8 Stipulation; Set Dead;omes: Factual Discovery to close by 5/15/2020; Plaintiff's Expert Disclosures shall be made by 6/15/2020; Defendant's Expert Disclosures shall be made by 7/15/2020; Expert Discovery to close by 8/15/2020 and Dispositive Motions shall be filed by 9/15/2020 - So Ordered by District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 8/7/2019. (Barletta, Barbara)
August 6, 2019 Filing 8 STIPULATION filed by Thomas A. Veronneau. (Pushee, Michael)
July 30, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Hearing: Telephonic Rule 16 Conference set for Thursday, 8/15/2019 at 09:15 AM before District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. The Court will initiate the call. Counsel shall provide the Clerk with contact information if it differs from the docket sheet. (Barletta, Barbara)
July 15, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint by HV Industries, Inc..(Khorsand, Ali)
June 26, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael D. Chittick on behalf of HV Industries, Inc. (Chittick, Michael)
June 25, 2019 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Thomas A. Veronneau. HV Industries, Inc. waiver sent on 6/24/2019, answer due 8/23/2019. (Formisano, V.)
June 25, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Ali Khorsand on behalf of HV Industries, Inc. (Khorsand, Ali)
June 20, 2019 Filing 2 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Potter, Carrie)
June 20, 2019 Case assigned to District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Potter, Carrie)
June 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1385769 ), filed by Thomas A. Veronneau. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Formisano, V.)
June 20, 2019 Filing 2 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Potter, Carrie)
June 20, 2019 Case assigned to District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Potter, Carrie)
June 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1385769 ), filed by Thomas A. Veronneau. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Formisano, V.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Veronneau v. HV Industries, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HV Industries, Inc.
Represented By: Ali Khorsand
Represented By: Michael D. Chittick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas A. Veronneau
Represented By: Nicole J. Policastro
Represented By: V. Edward Formisano
Represented By: Michael D. Pushee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?