Amesbury v. City of Pawtucket et al
Plaintiff: Mark E. Amesbury
Defendant: City of Pawtucket, Michael Polaceck, William D. Vieira, Sr., Donald R. Grebien, Melissa C and Donna M Pinto
Case Number: 1:2019cv00342
Filed: June 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: Lincoln D Almond
Referring Judge: John J McConnell
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 6, 2019 Filing 8 REPLY to Response re #7 Response to Motion to Dismiss filed by All Defendants. (DeSisto, Michael)
July 30, 2019 Filing 7 RESPONSE In Opposition to #6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Mark E. Amesbury. Replies due by 8/6/2019. (McGuire, Vickie)
July 17, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by All Defendants. Responses due by 7/31/2019. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Memorandum Defendants Memorandum in Support of their Motion to Dismiss)(DeSisto, Michael)
July 17, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael A. DeSisto on behalf of All Defendants (DeSisto, Michael)
July 2, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mark E. Amesbury. City of Pawtucket served on 6/27/2019, answer due 7/18/2019; Donald R. Grebien served on 6/27/2019, answer due 7/18/2019; Donna M Pinto served on 6/27/2019, answer due 7/18/2019; Michael Polaceck served on 6/27/2019, answer due 7/18/2019; William D. Vieira, Sr. served on 6/27/2019, answer due 7/18/2019. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(Potter, Carrie)
June 21, 2019 CASE PERMANENTLY ASSIGNED Since District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. has determined that this case is in fact related to CA 19-cv-82-JJM this case is permanently assigned to District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. for all further proceedings. (Urizandi, Nisshy)
June 20, 2019 Filing 3 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Potter, Carrie)
June 20, 2019 Filing 2 Pro Se Consent to Receive Documents Electronically filed by Mark E. Amesbury. (Potter, Carrie)
June 20, 2019 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Potter, Carrie)
June 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00 receipt number 14670022382 ), filed by Mark E. Amesbury. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Receipt)(Potter, Carrie)
June 20, 2019 CASE CONDITIONALLY ASSIGNED to District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. Related Case Number 19-cv-82 based upon the indication that a related case previously was assigned to the presiding judge. The assignment is subject to the presiding judge's determination that the cases, in fact, are related. (Potter, Carrie)
June 20, 2019 Filing 3 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Potter, Carrie)
June 20, 2019 Filing 2 Pro Se Consent to Receive Documents Electronically filed by Mark E. Amesbury. (Potter, Carrie)
June 20, 2019 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Potter, Carrie)
June 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00 receipt number 14670022382 ), filed by Mark E. Amesbury. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Receipt)(Potter, Carrie)
June 20, 2019 CASE CONDITIONALLY ASSIGNED to District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. Related Case Number 19-cv-82 based upon the indication that a related case previously was assigned to the presiding judge. The assignment is subject to the presiding judge's determination that the cases, in fact, are related. (Potter, Carrie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Amesbury v. City of Pawtucket et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Pawtucket
Represented By: Michael A. DeSisto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Polaceck
Represented By: Michael A. DeSisto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William D. Vieira, Sr.
Represented By: Michael A. DeSisto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald R. Grebien
Represented By: Michael A. DeSisto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Melissa C
Represented By: Michael A. DeSisto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donna M Pinto
Represented By: Michael A. DeSisto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark E. Amesbury
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?