Thompson v. Martin
Petitioner: Anthony Mondrez Thompson
Respondent: Daniel W. Martin
Case Number: 1:2019cv00350
Filed: June 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: Lincoln D Almond
Referring Judge: John J McConnell
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 23, 2019 Filing 16 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 8/72019 before Judge McConnell. 3-Day Transcript Selected. Transcript to be delivered within 3 calendar days. (McGuire, Vickie)
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER: Mr. Thompson's Motion for Reconsideration #14 is DENIED. Mr. Thompson has a pending criminal matter that is the reason for his incarceration and he is being afforded due process accordingly. There is no basis for this Court to reconsider its order dismissing this habeas petition - So Ordered by District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 8/22/2019. (Urizandi, Nisshy)
August 21, 2019 Filing 15 AFFIDAVIT by Anthony Mondrez Thompson. (McGuire, Vickie)
August 21, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION for Reconsideration re Order filed by Anthony Mondrez Thompson. Responses due by 9/4/2019. (McGuire, Vickie)
August 13, 2019 Filing 13 Letter from Anthony Thompson requesting transcript. Transcript order form forwarded to plaintiff. (Farrell Pletcher, Paula)
August 13, 2019 Filing 12 Letter from Anthony M. Thompson Requesting Docket Sheets. Dockets forwarded to Plaintiff. (Farrell Pletcher, Paula)
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER: For reasons stated in today's hearing, the Court denies #1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Anthony Mondrez Thompson. - So Ordered by District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 8/7/2019. (McGuire, Vickie)
August 7, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr.: Motion Hearing held on 8/7/2019 re (50 in 1:18-cv-00669-JJM-LDA) MOTION to Dismiss filed by Garrett Hassett, Jeffrey Konieczny, (44 in 1:18-cv-00669-JJM-LDA) MOTION to Amend/Correct (14) Amended Complaint filed by Anthony Mondrez Thompson, (1 in 1:19-cv-00350-JJM-LDA) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Anthony Mondrez Thompson, (46 in 1:18-cv-00669-JJM-LDA) MOTION to Amend/Correct Record filed by Anthony Mondrez Thompson. #1 IN 1:18cv-670 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Milind Shah & Helen Lee for Government. Matthew Dawson Stand by for Defendant. Kathering Sadeck & Sean Lyness for Defendant. Defendant present. For reasons stated in today's hearing, the Court granted in part & denied in part ECF#50 in CV18-669. The Court granted ECF# 44 & 46 in CV18-669; The Court denied ECF#1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus in CV 18-670 and denied #1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus in CV 19-350. See case also CR19-40JJM for further rulings. Defendant remanded. Court adjourned. (Court Reporter Karen Wischnowsky in Courtroom 1 at 10:10 am.) (McGuire, Vickie)
July 18, 2019 Filing 11 Letter from Anthony Thompson (Attachments: #1 Envelope, #2 Retuen Letter to Thompson from Clerk's Office, #3 Return Letter to Wyatt from Clerk's Office) (Potter, Carrie) (Attachment 3 replaced on 7/18/2019) (Potter, Carrie).
July 12, 2019 Filing 10 Letter from Anthony Thompson: Mailed updated docket sheet & copy of ECF#8 docketed 7/8/2019. (McGuire, Vickie)
July 12, 2019 Filing 9 Letter Anthony Thompson: Mailed docket sheet & copy of ECF#6 filed on 7/8/2019. (McGuire, Vickie)
July 8, 2019 Filing 8 Filing fee: $ 5.00, receipt number 14670022440. (Potter, Carrie)
July 8, 2019 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion #1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus : Motion Hearing set for Wednesday, 8/7/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 1 before District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. (Barletta, Barbara)
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER AND NOTICE OF HEARING - So Ordered by District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 7/8/2019. (Barletta, Barbara)
July 8, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE and Demand Pursuant to 18 U.S.C. 241 and 242 Misprison 18 U.S.C. 4 and 2382 by Anthony Mondrez Thompson (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(Potter, Carrie)
July 3, 2019 Filing 5 Letter from Anthony Thompson. Docket mailed on 7/3/2019. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (Potter, Carrie)
July 3, 2019 Filing 4 Civil Cover Sheet filed by Anthony Mondrez Thompson. Regarding New Case: Corrective Docket Entry,. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(Potter, Carrie)
July 3, 2019 Filing 3 Letter from Anthony Thompson (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (Potter, Carrie)
June 27, 2019 CORRECTIVE DOCKET ENTRY Regarding: #1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus. This case has been electronically filed and processed, however, after a quality control review the following deficiencies were found: Civil Cover Sheet not attached. The filer is directed to file a Civil Cover Sheet. (Potter, Carrie)
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER entered directing the petitioner to pay the habeas corpus filing fee in the amount of $5.00 or to file a motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis Filing Fee or Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis due on or before 7/18/2019. So Ordered by District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 6/27/2019. (Potter, Carrie)
June 27, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Anthony Mondrez Thompson. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(Potter, Carrie)
June 27, 2019 CORRECTIVE DOCKET ENTRY Regarding: #1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus. This case has been electronically filed and processed, however, after a quality control review the following deficiencies were found: Civil Cover Sheet not attached. The filer is directed to file a Civil Cover Sheet. (Potter, Carrie)
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER entered directing the petitioner to pay the habeas corpus filing fee in the amount of $5.00 or to file a motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis Filing Fee or Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis due on or before 7/18/2019. So Ordered by District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 6/27/2019. (Potter, Carrie)
June 27, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Anthony Mondrez Thompson. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(Potter, Carrie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thompson v. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Anthony Mondrez Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Daniel W. Martin
Represented By: Zachary A. Cunha
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?