Renee Keyser et al v. Bristol Warren Regional School District et al
Plaintiff: N.K., Shawn Keyser and Renee Keyser
Defendant: Marisa Joinsen, The Town of Warren, Bristol Warren Regional School Committee, Bristol Warren Regional School District, Cindy Giroux, Mario J. Andrade and The Town of Bristol
Case Number: 1:2019cv00351
Filed: June 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: Lincoln D Almond
Referring Judge: William E Smith
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 20:1400
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 3, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER to #3 Amended Complaint by Bristol Warren Regional School Committee, Bristol Warren Regional School District.(DeSisto, Marc)
October 3, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #11 Motion to Withdraw and terminating #9 Motion to Dismiss in light of the dismissal of the moving parties, Town of Bristol and Town of Warren pursuant to Text Order entered on 10/2/19 on #10 Stipulation of Dismissal. So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 10/3/2019. (Jackson, Ryan)
October 3, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Withdraw #9 MOTION to Dismiss filed by The Town of Bristol, The Town of Warren. Responses due by 10/17/2019. (DeSisto, Marc)
October 2, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER Entering #10 Stipulation of Dismissal without prejudice only as to Defendants The Town of Warren, The Town of Bristol. So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 10/2/2019. (Jackson, Ryan)
October 1, 2019 Filing 10 STIPULATION of dismissal filed by The Town of Bristol, The Town of Warren. (DeSisto, Marc)
September 27, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss filed by The Town of Bristol, The Town of Warren. Responses due by 10/11/2019. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Memorandum)(DeSisto, Marc)
September 13, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for an Extension of Time extend time to serve and allow early (limited) discovery for one defendant filed by N.K., Renee Keyser, Shawn Keyser. Responses due by 9/27/2019. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Memorandum)(Munro-Delotto, Paige)
September 13, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by N.K., Shawn Keyser, Renee Keyser. Bristol Warren Regional School Committee served on 9/12/2019, answer due 10/3/2019; Bristol Warren Regional School District served on 9/12/2019, answer due 10/3/2019; The Town of Bristol served on 9/12/2019, answer due 10/3/2019; The Town of Warren served on 9/12/2019, answer due 10/3/2019. (Munro-Delotto, Paige)
September 11, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Bristol Warren Regional School Committee, Bristol Warren Regional School District, The Town of Bristol, The Town of Warren. (Potter, Carrie)
September 11, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Bristol Warren Regional School Committee. (Potter, Carrie)
September 11, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Request filed by N.K., Renee Keyser, Shawn Keyser. (Munro-Delotto, Paige)
September 11, 2019 Filing 3 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Bristol Warren Regional School Committee, Bristol Warren Regional School District, Marisa Joinsen, The Town of Bristol, The Town of Warren, filed by N.K., Shawn Keyser, Renee Keyser.(Munro-Delotto, Paige)
July 1, 2019 Filing 2 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Potter, Carrie)
July 1, 2019 Filing 2 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Potter, Carrie)
July 1, 2019 Filing 2 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Potter, Carrie)
June 30, 2019 Case assigned to Chief Judge William E. Smith and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Potter, Carrie)
June 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1390594 ), filed by N.K. a minor, Shawn Keyser, Renee Keyser. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Munro-Delotto, Paige)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Renee Keyser et al v. Bristol Warren Regional School District et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marisa Joinsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Town of Warren
Represented By: Marc DeSisto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bristol Warren Regional School Committee
Represented By: Marc DeSisto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bristol Warren Regional School District
Represented By: Marc DeSisto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cindy Giroux
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mario J. Andrade
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Town of Bristol
Represented By: Marc DeSisto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: N.K.
Represented By: Paige Alexandra Munro-Delotto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shawn Keyser
Represented By: Paige Alexandra Munro-Delotto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Renee Keyser
Represented By: Paige Alexandra Munro-Delotto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?