Grant v. Harris
Plaintiff: William Lee Grant, II
Defendant: Gregory K. Harris
Case Number: 1:2019cv00353
Filed: July 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: Lincoln D Almond
Referring Judge: William E Smith
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 27, 2019 Filing 5 OBJECTION to #4 Report and Recommendations filed by William Lee Grant, II. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(Potter, Carrie)
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION FOR SUMMARY DISMISSAL PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. SECTION 1915(e) and ORDER - Plaintiff's Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees (ECF Doc. No. 2) is GRANTED. However, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2)(B)(i) and (ii), I recommend that Plaintiff's Complaint (ECF Doc. No. 1) be DISMISSED with prejudice re #1 Complaint filed by William Lee Grant, II, #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by William Lee Grant, II ( Objections to R&R due by 9/3/2019.). So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond on 8/20/2019. (Noel, Jeannine)
July 3, 2019 MOTIONS REFERRED: #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis referred for determination to Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Urizandi, Nisshy)
July 2, 2019 Notice of Availability to Receive Documents Electronically. Pro Se litigants are encouraged to review the details of the Consent & Registration Form and if interested, complete the Registration Form and return it to the Clerks Office. Click # here to access the form. (Potter, Carrie)
July 2, 2019 Filing 3 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Potter, Carrie)
July 1, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by William Lee Grant, II. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(Potter, Carrie)
July 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, filed by William Lee Grant, II. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 "Sailor Moon" Card, #3 Envelope)(Potter, Carrie)
July 1, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by William Lee Grant, II. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(Potter, Carrie)
July 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, filed by William Lee Grant, II. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 "Sailor Moon" Card, #3 Envelope)(Potter, Carrie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Grant v. Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregory K. Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Lee Grant, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?