Morra v. Rhode Island Airport Corporation - DOT
Plaintiff: Lawrence A. Morra
Defendant: Rhode Island Airport Corporation - DOT
Case Number: 1:2019cv00354
Filed: July 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: John J McConnell
Referring Judge: Patricia A Sullivan
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 13, 2019 Filing 6 JUDGMENT dismissing the Plaintiff's Complaint (ECF No. #1 ) entered by the Clerk of Court on 8/13/2019. (Urizandi, Nisshy)
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER: A Fifth Amendment takings claim is not ripe for federal adjudication until the landowner has sought compensation through state procedures. Mr. Morra's claim is based on the state's inadequate compensation for trees it removed from his property under an avigation easement. Because this matter is currently being litigated in a lawsuit Mr. Morra brought that is pending in R.I. Superior Court, the federal court lacks jurisdiction to address this dispute. The Defendants' Motion to Dismiss #4 is GRANTED. This case is terminated - So Ordered by District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 8/13/2019. (Urizandi, Nisshy)
August 1, 2019 Filing 5 RESPONSE In Opposition to #4 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , failure to state a claim, lack of service and process of service MOTION to Dismiss filed by Lawrence A. Morra. Replies due by 8/8/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Potter, Carrie)
July 23, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , failure to state a claim, lack of service and process of service, MOTION to Dismiss filed by Rhode Island Airport Corporation - DOT. Responses due by 8/6/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Weiner, Harris)
July 9, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lawrence A. Morra. Rhode Island Airport Corporation - DOT served on 7/2/2019, answer due 7/23/2019. (Potter, Carrie)
July 1, 2019 Notice of Availability to Receive Documents Electronically. Pro Se litigants are encouraged to review the details of the Consent & Registration Form and if interested, complete the Registration Form and return it to the Clerks Office. Click # here to access the form. (Potter, Carrie)
July 1, 2019 Filing 2 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Potter, Carrie)
July 1, 2019 Summons Issued as to Rhode Island Airport Corporation - DOT. (Potter, Carrie)
July 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00 receipt number 14670022419 ), filed by Lawrence A. Morra. (Attachments: #1 Letter, #2 Exhibit, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Receipt)(Potter, Carrie)
July 1, 2019 Notice of Availability to Receive Documents Electronically. Pro Se litigants are encouraged to review the details of the Consent & Registration Form and if interested, complete the Registration Form and return it to the Clerks Office. Click # here to access the form. (Potter, Carrie)
July 1, 2019 Filing 2 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Potter, Carrie)
July 1, 2019 Summons Issued as to Rhode Island Airport Corporation - DOT. (Potter, Carrie)
July 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00 receipt number 14670022419 ), filed by Lawrence A. Morra. (Attachments: #1 Letter, #2 Exhibit, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Receipt)(Potter, Carrie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Morra v. Rhode Island Airport Corporation - DOT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lawrence A. Morra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rhode Island Airport Corporation - DOT
Represented By: Harris K. Weiner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?