Bell v. Baker et al
Plaintiff: Sylvanius Bell
Defendant: James Baker, Baker Potts, Leonard Bell, Martin Luther King, III, Pia Haynes Williams, James Winters, Aliko Dangote, CBS, Royce West, Verizon Communications, Jean Colby, Ronnie Brown, Jean Coby, Akhtar Khwaja, Baker Botts and Edward Khudainatov
Case Number: 1:2019cv00355
Filed: July 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: John J McConnell
Referring Judge: William E Smith
2 Judge: Patricia A Sullivan
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER OF RECUSAL entered: District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. recused. Case reassigned to Chief Judge William E. Smith for all further proceedings - So Ordered by District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 8/22/2019. (Barletta, Barbara)
August 19, 2019 Filing 18 FOURTH AMENDED COMPLAINT against James Baker, Baker Botts, Leonard Bell, Ronnie Brown, Jean Coby, Jean Colby, Edward Khudainatov, Akhtar Khwaja, Martin Luther King, III, Royce West, Aliko Dangote, Verizon Communications, CBS, filed by Sylvanius Bell. (Attachments: #1 Supplement, #2 Supplement, #3 Supplement) (Urizandi, Nisshy)
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #17 Motion to Amend/Correct - So Ordered by District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 8/19/2019. (Urizandi, Nisshy)
August 15, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION to Amend/Correct #13 Amended Complaint filed by Sylvanius Bell. Responses due by 8/29/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Amended Complaint 1, #2 Proposed Amended Complaint 2, #3 Proposed Amended Complaint 2 - Summons and USM 285, #4 Proposed Amended Complaint 3, #5 Proposed Amended Complaint - Summons and USM 285, #6 Proposed Amended Complaint 4, #7 Proposed Amended Complaint - Summons and USM 285)(Farrell Pletcher, Paula)
August 15, 2019 Filing 16 AMENDED Civil Cover Sheet filed by Sylvanius Bell. Regarding New Case: #1 Complaint. (Urizandi, Nisshy)
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #15 Motion to Amend/Correct - So Ordered by District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 8/15/2019. (Urizandi, Nisshy)
August 14, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION to Amend/Correct Civil Cover Sheet filed by Sylvanius Bell. Responses due by 8/28/2019. (Attachments: #1 Amended civil cover sheet)(Barbour, Travis)
August 13, 2019 Filing 14 Summons Issued as to James Baker, Leonard Bell, Ronnie Brown, Edward Khudainatov, Akhtar Khwaja, Martin Luther King, III, Royce West. Summons and USM-285 Forms forwarded to the US Marshals Service for service. (Simoncelli, Michael)
August 8, 2019 Filing 13 THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Sylvanius Bell. (Attachments: #1 Supplement to the Complaint, #2 Affidavit, #3 Affidavit, #4 Affidavit)(Urizandi, Nisshy)
August 8, 2019 CORRECTIVE DOCKET ENTRY Regarding: 12 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct - a number was given to this entry in error. (Urizandi, Nisshy)
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 TEXT ORDER granting #11 Motion to Amend/Correct - So Ordered by District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 8/8/2019. (Urizandi, Nisshy)
August 7, 2019 Filing 11 First MOTION to Amend/Correct filed by Sylvanius Bell. Responses due by 8/21/2019. (Attachments: #1 Amended Complaint, #2 Supplement to the Complaint, #3 Affidavit, #4 Affidavit, #5 Affidavit)(Urizandi, Nisshy)
August 6, 2019 Filing 10 Letter sent to Sylvanius Bell requesting that the Process Receipt and Return form (USM-285) and summons be completed in order for the U.S. Marshals Service to effectuate service pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(c)(3). USM -285 form can be found by clicking # here. (Urizandi, Nisshy)
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order AMENDED TEXT ORDER: Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration #9 is GRANTED. Plaintiff has set forth a claim in this motion upon which relief could be granted, and therefore is entitled to have the complaint served and answered. Plaintiffs Motion for Leave to Proceed IFP #2 is GRANTED. - So Ordered by District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 8/6/2019. (Urizandi, Nisshy) Modified on 8/6/2019 (Urizandi, Nisshy).
August 2, 2019 Filing 9 First MOTION for Reconsideration re #6 Amended Complaint Second Amended Complaint filed by Sylvanius Bell. Responses due by 8/16/2019. (Urizandi, Nisshy)
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER: Plaintiff's Amended Complaint again does not state a claim upon which relief can be granted. It appears to be frivolous. A complaint is frivolous "where it lacks an arguable basis either in law or in fact." Further, the term frivolous "embraces not only the inarguable legal conclusion, but also the fanciful factual allegation." Neitzke v. Williams, 490 U.S. 319, 325 (1989). Therefore, pursuant to 28 U.S.C.A. 1915(e)(2), this Court and denies the #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and DISMISSES THIS MATTER- So Ordered by District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 7/19/2019. (Barletta, Barbara)
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER denying #7 Motion for Writ of Execution - So Ordered by District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 7/19/2019. (Barletta, Barbara)
July 18, 2019 Filing 8 EXHIBIT IN SUPPORT by Sylvanius Bell in support of #6 Amended Complaint. (Potter, Carrie)
July 18, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Writ of Execution filed by Sylvanius Bell. Responses due by 8/1/2019. (Potter, Carrie)
July 11, 2019 Filing 6 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Sylvanius Bell. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Potter, Carrie)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER: The Court has reviewed the Plaintiff's Amended Complaint #5 and again finds it deficient for the same reasons stated in the prior order of this Court. Plaintiff is granted leave to file a Second Amended Complaint within 30 days - So Ordered by District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 7/3/2019. (Urizandi, Nisshy)
July 2, 2019 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Sylvanius Bell. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Summons)(Potter, Carrie)
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: The Court has reviewed Sylvanius Bell's Complaint under 28 U.S.C. 1915. The Court finds that Mr. Bell's Complaint does not state a claim upon which relief can be granted. There are no facts or legal claims stated.The Court grants Mr. Bell 30 days to file an amended complaint. If a valid amended complaint is not filed within 30 days, this matter will be dismissed without prejudice - So Ordered by District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 7/2/2019. (Urizandi, Nisshy)
July 1, 2019 Notice of Availability to Receive Documents Electronically. Pro Se litigants are encouraged to review the details of the Consent & Registration Form and if interested, complete the Registration Form and return it to the Clerks Office. Click # here to access the form. (Potter, Carrie)
July 1, 2019 Filing 3 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Potter, Carrie)
July 1, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Sylvanius Bell. (Potter, Carrie)
July 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, filed by Sylvanius Bell. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Potter, Carrie)
July 1, 2019 Notice of Availability to Receive Documents Electronically. Pro Se litigants are encouraged to review the details of the Consent & Registration Form and if interested, complete the Registration Form and return it to the Clerks Office. Click # here to access the form. (Potter, Carrie)
July 1, 2019 Filing 3 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Potter, Carrie)
July 1, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Sylvanius Bell. (Potter, Carrie)
July 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, filed by Sylvanius Bell. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Potter, Carrie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bell v. Baker et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Baker Potts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leonard Bell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martin Luther King, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pia Haynes Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Winters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aliko Dangote
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Royce West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Verizon Communications
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jean Colby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronnie Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jean Coby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Akhtar Khwaja
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Baker Botts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edward Khudainatov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sylvanius Bell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?