AMICA Mutual Insurance Company v. Fluidmaster, Inc.
Plaintiff: AMICA Mutual Insurance Company
Defendant: Fluidmaster, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00359
Filed: July 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: Lincoln D Almond
Referring Judge: John J McConnell
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to #8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM ; Reset Deadlines: Responses due by 9/9/2019. - So Ordered by District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 8/19/2019. (Barletta, Barbara)
August 19, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for an Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by AMICA Mutual Insurance Company. Responses due by 9/3/2019. (Rome, Judah)
August 12, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Fluidmaster, Inc.. Responses due by 8/26/2019. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Memorandum)(Thomen, Jeffrey)
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time; Reset Deadlines: Fluidmaster, Inc. answer or any responsive pleading due 8/12/2019 - So Ordered by District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 7/8/2019. (Barletta, Barbara) Modified on 7/9/2019 (Barletta, Barbara).
July 8, 2019 Filing 7 STATE COURT RECORD received electronically from the State of Rhode Island. (Potter, Carrie)
July 8, 2019 Filing 6 RESPONSE In Opposition to #5 MOTION for an Extension of Time to Answer, Move or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint filed by AMICA Mutual Insurance Company. Replies due by 7/15/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit of Service, #2 Exhibit USPS Tracking Information, #3 Exhibit Notice of Claim)(Rome, Judah)
July 5, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for an Extension of Time to Answer, Move or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Fluidmaster, Inc.. Responses due by 7/19/2019. (Thomen, Jeffrey)
July 2, 2019 Filing 4 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Potter, Carrie)
July 2, 2019 Case assigned to District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Potter, Carrie)
July 2, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Fluidmaster, Inc.. (Thomen, Jeffrey)
July 2, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey M. Thomen on behalf of Fluidmaster, Inc. (Thomen, Jeffrey)
July 2, 2019 Filing 1 NEW CASE/NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Providence County Superior Court, Case Number PC-2019-6121. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0103-1391432, filed by Fluidmaster, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 State Court Notice of Filling Notice of Removal, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Thomen, Jeffrey)
July 2, 2019 Filing 4 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Potter, Carrie)
July 2, 2019 Case assigned to District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Potter, Carrie)
July 2, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Fluidmaster, Inc.. (Thomen, Jeffrey)
July 2, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey M. Thomen on behalf of Fluidmaster, Inc. (Thomen, Jeffrey)
July 2, 2019 Filing 1 NEW CASE/NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Providence County Superior Court, Case Number PC-2019-6121. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0103-1391432, filed by Fluidmaster, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 State Court Notice of Filling Notice of Removal, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Thomen, Jeffrey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: AMICA Mutual Insurance Company v. Fluidmaster, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fluidmaster, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Thomen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AMICA Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Judah H. Rome
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?