Jeff-Anthony Properties, Inc. et al v. Alviti et al
Plaintiff: Jeff-Anthony Properties II, Inc., Jeff-Anthony Properties, Inc. and Shop In America, Inc.
Defendant: Peter Alviti and Bruce R. Cadden
Case Number: 1:2019cv00360
Filed: July 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: Lincoln D Almond
Referring Judge: John J McConnell
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 11, 2019 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Jeff-Anthony Properties, Inc., Shop In America, Inc., Jeff-Anthony Properties II, Inc.. Peter Alviti waiver sent on 7/8/2019, answer due 9/6/2019. (Daly, Michael)
July 11, 2019 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Jeff-Anthony Properties, Inc., Shop In America, Inc., Jeff-Anthony Properties II, Inc.. Bruce R. Cadden waiver sent on 7/8/2019, answer due 9/6/2019. (Daly, Michael)
July 3, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Peter Alviti, Bruce R. Cadden. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Potter, Carrie)
July 3, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Request filed by Jeff-Anthony Properties II, Inc., Jeff-Anthony Properties, Inc., Shop In America, Inc.. (Daly, Michael)
July 3, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Request filed by Jeff-Anthony Properties II, Inc., Jeff-Anthony Properties, Inc., Shop In America, Inc.. (Daly, Michael)
July 2, 2019 Filing 2 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Potter, Carrie)
July 2, 2019 Case assigned to District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Potter, Carrie)
July 2, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1391434 ), filed by Jeff-Anthony Properties, Inc., Shop In America, Inc., Jeff-Anthony Properties II, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit June 12, 2019 letter, #2 Exhibit Photos, #3 Exhibit Photos, #4 Exhibit Photos, #5 Exhibit Photos, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Daly, Michael)
July 2, 2019 Filing 2 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Potter, Carrie)
July 2, 2019 Case assigned to District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Potter, Carrie)
July 2, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1391434 ), filed by Jeff-Anthony Properties, Inc., Shop In America, Inc., Jeff-Anthony Properties II, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit June 12, 2019 letter, #2 Exhibit Photos, #3 Exhibit Photos, #4 Exhibit Photos, #5 Exhibit Photos, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Daly, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jeff-Anthony Properties, Inc. et al v. Alviti et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeff-Anthony Properties II, Inc.
Represented By: Nicole M. Matteo
Represented By: Michael J. Daly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeff-Anthony Properties, Inc.
Represented By: Nicole M. Matteo
Represented By: Michael J. Daly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shop In America, Inc.
Represented By: Nicole M. Matteo
Represented By: Michael J. Daly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter Alviti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bruce R. Cadden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?