Equal Employment Opportunity Commission v. Citizens Bank, N.A.
Plaintiff: Equal Employment Opportunity Commission
Defendant: Citizens Bank, N.A.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00362
Filed: July 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: William E Smith
Referring Judge: Patricia A Sullivan
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 29:0794
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 9, 2019 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. Citizens Bank, N.A. waiver sent on 7/3/2019, answer due 9/3/2019. (Smolik, Sara)
July 3, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Citizens Bank, N.A.. (Potter, Carrie)
July 3, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Request filed by Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. (Smolik, Sara)
July 2, 2019 Filing 2 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Potter, Carrie)
July 2, 2019 Case assigned to Chief Judge William E. Smith and Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (Potter, Carrie)
July 2, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (No fee paid, USA, Waived by Statute, or IFP.), filed by Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Action Cover Sheet)(Smolik, Sara)
July 2, 2019 Filing 2 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Potter, Carrie)
July 2, 2019 Case assigned to Chief Judge William E. Smith and Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (Potter, Carrie)
July 2, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (No fee paid, USA, Waived by Statute, or IFP.), filed by Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Action Cover Sheet)(Smolik, Sara)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Equal Employment Opportunity Commission v. Citizens Bank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citizens Bank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Equal Employment Opportunity Commission
Represented By: Sara Smolik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?