Plonsky v. Alta Hospitals System, Inc.
Plaintiff: Rebecca Plonsky
Defendant: Alta Hospitals System, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00365
Filed: July 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: Lincoln D Almond
Referring Judge: John J McConnell
2 Judge: Patricia A Sullivan
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #6 Motion to Dismiss claims and stay case pending binding arbitration - So Ordered by District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 8/21/2019. (Barletta, Barbara)
August 20, 2019 Filing 6 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Claims In Favor of Binding Arbitration And Stay Case filed by Alta Hospitals System, Inc.. Responses due by 9/3/2019. (Folger-Hartwell, Jillian)
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER OF RECUSAL entered. Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond recused. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan for all further referrals. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond on 7/8/2019. (Noel, Jeannine)
July 3, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Alta Hospitals System, Inc.. (Potter, Carrie)
July 3, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Request filed by Rebecca Plonsky. (Formisano, V.)
July 3, 2019 Filing 2 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Potter, Carrie)
July 3, 2019 Case assigned to District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Potter, Carrie)
July 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1391726 ), filed by Rebecca Plonsky. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Formisano, V.)
July 3, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Alta Hospitals System, Inc.. (Potter, Carrie)
July 3, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Request filed by Rebecca Plonsky. (Formisano, V.)
July 3, 2019 Filing 2 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Potter, Carrie)
July 3, 2019 Case assigned to District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Potter, Carrie)
July 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1391726 ), filed by Rebecca Plonsky. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Formisano, V.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Plonsky v. Alta Hospitals System, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rebecca Plonsky
Represented By: Nicole J. Policastro
Represented By: V. Edward Formisano
Represented By: Michael D. Pushee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alta Hospitals System, Inc.
Represented By: Jillian S. Folger-Hartwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?