Conant, II v. Block Island Power Company, Inc.
Plaintiff: Howell T Conant, II
Defendant: Block Island Power Company, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00371
Filed: July 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: John J McConnell
Referring Judge: Patricia A Sullivan
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 4, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Hearing: Telephonic Rule 16 Conference set for Tuesday, 9/24/2019 at 09:30 AM before District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. The Court will initiate the call. Counsel shall provide the Clerk with contact information if it differs from the docket sheet. (Barletta, Barbara)
August 28, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint by Block Island Power Company, Inc..(Folger-Hartwell, Jillian)
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time; Reset Deadlines: Block Island Power Company, Inc. answer due 8/28/2019 - So Ordered by District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 8/28/2019. (Barletta, Barbara)
August 26, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for an Extension of Time To Enlarge Time for Defendant to Respond to Complaint filed by Block Island Power Company, Inc.. Responses due by 9/9/2019. (Folger-Hartwell, Jillian)
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entering #6 Stipulation to extend time to answer; Reset Deadlines: Block Island Power Company, Inc. answer due 8/26/2019 - So Ordered by District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 8/20/2019. (Barletta, Barbara)
August 20, 2019 Filing 6 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT filed by Block Island Power Company, Inc.. (Folger-Hartwell, Jillian)
July 12, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Howell T Conant, II. Block Island Power Company, Inc. served on 7/12/2019, answer due 8/2/2019. (Formisano, V.)
July 10, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Block Island Power Company, Inc.. (Potter, Carrie)
July 10, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Request filed by Howell T Conant, II. (Formisano, V.)
July 10, 2019 Filing 2 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Potter, Carrie)
July 10, 2019 Case assigned to District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (Potter, Carrie)
July 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1393674 ), filed by Howell T Conant, II. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Formisano, V.)
July 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1393674 ), filed by Howell T Conant, II. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Formisano, V.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Conant, II v. Block Island Power Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Howell T Conant, II
Represented By: V. Edward Formisano
Represented By: Michael D. Pushee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Block Island Power Company, Inc.
Represented By: Jillian S. Folger-Hartwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?