Petrozzi v. Electric Boat Corporation
Plaintiff: James Petrozzi
Defendant: Electric Boat Corporation
Case Number: 1:2019cv00377
Filed: July 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: Lincoln D Almond
Referring Judge: William E Smith
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 18:2511
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 5, 2019 Filing 9 RESPONSE In Opposition to #7 MOTION to Dismiss filed by James Petrozzi. Replies due by 8/12/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Potter, Carrie)
August 5, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by James Petrozzi (Potter, Carrie)
July 22, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Electric Boat Corporation. Responses due by 8/5/2019. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Memorandum Defendant Memorandum in Support of Its Motion to Dismiss, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A in support of Motion to Dismiss)(Spacone, Aaron)
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Tracy Thomas Boland. So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 7/17/2019. (Potter, Carrie)
July 17, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Tracy Thomas Boland to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 100.00, receipt number 0103-1397859 ) filed by Electric Boat Corporation. (Spacone, Aaron)
July 16, 2019 Filing 5 STATE COURT RECORD received electronically from the State of Rhode Island. (Potter, Carrie)
July 15, 2019 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Electric Boat Corporation identifying Corporate Parent General Dynamics Corporation for Electric Boat Corporation.. (Spacone, Aaron)
July 15, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Aaron A. Spacone on behalf of Electric Boat Corporation (Spacone, Aaron)
July 15, 2019 Notice of Availability to Receive Documents Electronically. Pro Se litigants are encouraged to review the details of the Consent & Registration Form and if interested, complete the Registration Form and return it to the Clerks Office. Click # here to access the form. (Potter, Carrie)
July 15, 2019 Filing 2 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Potter, Carrie)
July 15, 2019 Case assigned to Chief Judge William E. Smith and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Potter, Carrie)
July 15, 2019 Filing 1 NEW CASE/NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Kent County Superior Court, Case Number KC-2019-0606. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0103-1396215, filed by Electric Boat Corporation.(Spacone, Aaron)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Petrozzi v. Electric Boat Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Petrozzi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Electric Boat Corporation
Represented By: Aaron A. Spacone
Represented By: Tracy Thomas Boland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?