Madyun v. Newport Housing Authority
Plaintiff: Atif S. Madyun
Defendant: Newport Housing Authority
Case Number: 1:2019cv00395
Filed: July 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: William E Smith
Referring Judge: Patricia A Sullivan
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accommodations
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 17, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Hearing: Rule 16 Conference set for 10/23/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom B before Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (Saucier, Martha)
September 16, 2019 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan to conduct a Rule 16 Conference. (Urizandi, Nisshy)
September 16, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Brenda Coville Harrigan on behalf of Newport Housing Authority (Harrigan, Brenda)
September 16, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Newport Housing Authority.(Harrigan, Brenda)
September 5, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed Newport Housing Authority served on 8/27/2019, answer due 9/17/2019. (Potter, Carrie)
September 5, 2019 Filing 9 USMS Indigent Filer Reimbursement Request. (Potter, Carrie)
August 20, 2019 Filing 8 EXHIBIT IN SUPPORT by Atif S. Madyun in support of #1 Complaint. (Potter, Carrie)
August 20, 2019 Filing 7 Mail Returned: Mail sent to Atif S. Madyun returned as undeliverable. Resent to plaintiff's updated address. (Simoncelli, Michael)
July 30, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Newport Housing Authority. (Potter, Carrie)
July 30, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Request filed by Atif S. Madyun. (Potter, Carrie)
July 30, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Change of Address by Atif S. Madyun (Potter, Carrie)
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan on 7/29/2019. (Leyva, Lucia)
July 26, 2019 MOTIONS REFERRED: #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis referred for determination to Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (Urizandi, Nisshy)
July 23, 2019 Notice of Availability to Receive Documents Electronically. Pro Se litigants are encouraged to review the details of the Consent & Registration Form and if interested, complete the Registration Form and return it to the Clerks Office. Click # here to access the form. (Potter, Carrie)
July 23, 2019 Filing 3 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Potter, Carrie)
July 23, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Atif S. Madyun. (Potter, Carrie)
July 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, filed by Atif S. Madyun. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Potter, Carrie)
July 23, 2019 Notice of Availability to Receive Documents Electronically. Pro Se litigants are encouraged to review the details of the Consent & Registration Form and if interested, complete the Registration Form and return it to the Clerks Office. Click # here to access the form. (Potter, Carrie)
July 23, 2019 Filing 3 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Potter, Carrie)
July 23, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Atif S. Madyun. (Potter, Carrie)
July 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, filed by Atif S. Madyun. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Potter, Carrie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Madyun v. Newport Housing Authority
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Atif S. Madyun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Newport Housing Authority
Represented By: Brenda Coville Harrigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?