Federal Trade Commission v. Gotra et al

Plaintiff: Federal Trade Commission
Defendant: Jessica Merrick, Alliance Security, Inc., Jessica Bright, Power Marketing Promotions LLC, Defend America LLC, Jessica Dudlicek, Jasjit Gotra and Kevin Klink
Case Number: 1:2019cv00410
Filed: August 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: Lincoln D Almond
Referring Judge: John J McConnell
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:45
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 1, 2019 Filing 82 Case transferred in from District of Massachusetts; Case Number 1:18-cv-10548. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Pursuant to LR Gen 201(b)(5), counsel who is a member in good standing of the bar of another federal district court is exempt from the requirements of bar membership, and may appear and practice in this Court for this case. Counsel is directed to register as an ECF Filing User in accordance with LR Gen 304(a) by completing the ECF Registration Form located under the CM/ECF Quick Link from our website. #http://www.rid.uscourts.gov
July 31, 2019 Filing 81 Case transferred to District of Rhode Island; Original file with documents numbered all documents, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet sent to Clerk in that district. (Halley, Taylor)
July 31, 2019 Filing 80 Judge George A. O'Toole, Jr: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. A district court may transfer any civil action to another district "[f]or the convenience of the parties and witnesses" and "in the interest of justice." 28 U.S.C. 1404(a). "It is well settled that a court may transfer a case sua sponte pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a)." Desmond v. Nynex Corp., 37 F.3d 1484, at *3 (1st Cir. 1994) (unpublished table decision). Here, the last remaining defendant, Jasjit Gotra, is a resident of Rhode Island, the claims arise from conduct that was centered in Rhode Island, and a significant number of witnesses and evidence appear to be located in Rhode Island. Further, there are related actions pending in the United States Bankruptcy Court for the District of Rhode Island, including a Chapter 11 bankruptcy proceeding involving Alliance Security, Inc., as debtor, in which there is a pending adversary proceeding involving Gotra. Any appeal or motion to withdraw the reference regarding that proceeding would be brought in the United States District Court for the District of Rhode Island. For the foregoing reasons, transfer to that Court would be convenient for many of the parties and witnesses and would be in the interest of justice. Consequently, it is hereby ordered that this action be transferred to the United States District Court for the District of Rhode Island pursuant to section 1404(a). (Halley, Taylor)
July 31, 2019 Filing 79 Notice of correction to docket made by Court staff. Correction: Docket entry #79. Corrected because: Duplicate filing of docket entry #78 due to clerk error. (Halley, Taylor)
July 31, 2019 Filing 78 Judge George A. O'Toole, Jr: ORDER entered granting #7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Against Defendant Gotra . PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION (Halley, Taylor)
July 31, 2019 Filing 77 Judge George A. O'Toole, Jr: ORDER entered granting #73 Consent MOTION to Approve Consent Judgment and Stipulated Final Order. Stipulated Final Order for Permanent Injunction and Civil Penalty Judgment as to Defendant Alliance Security, Inc. (Halley, Taylor)
July 31, 2019 Filing 76 Judge George A. O'Toole, Jr: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered denying #33 Motion to Dismiss (Halley, Taylor)
July 31, 2019 Filing 75 Judge George A. O'Toole, Jr: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered finding as moot #26 Motion to Change Venue (Halley, Taylor)
July 24, 2019 Filing 74 Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge George A. OToole, Jr: Motion Hearing held on 7/24/2019 re #7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Against Defendants Gotra and Alliance Security filed by Federal Trade Commission. The court takes the matter under advisement. (Court Reporter: Kathleen Silva at kathysilva@verizon.net.)(Attorneys present: For Plaintiff: Ian Barlow, Tejasvi Srimushnam; For Defendant Jasjit Gotra ( Pro Se)) (Lyness, Paul)
July 23, 2019 Filing 73 Consent MOTION to Approve Consent Judgment and Stipulated Final Order by Federal Trade Commission. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Barlow, Ian) Modified on 7/31/2019 (Halley, Taylor).
July 23, 2019 Filing 72 Notice: In addition to FTC's Motion for Preliminary Injunction, the parties should be prepared to discuss the issue of venue at the motion hearing scheduled for July 24, 2019. (Halley, Taylor)
July 15, 2019 Filing 71 Judge George A. O'Toole, Jr: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. The Joint Motion to Stay as to Defendant Alliance Security, Inc. is GRANTED. The case against Alliance is stayed until August 30, 2019. The hearing on FTC's #7 Motion for Preliminary Injunction will proceed as scheduled as to defendant Jasjit Gotra only and will be limited to oral argument. Alliance is excused from attending the hearing. (Halley, Taylor)
July 11, 2019 Filing 69 NOTICE by Federal Trade Commission re 66 Order Setting Hearing on Motion, Notice of Parties Agreement to Proceed with Oral Argument only (Barlow, Ian)
July 11, 2019 Filing 68 Joint MOTION to Stay as to Defendant Alliance Security Inc. (and not defendant Gotra) by Federal Trade Commission.(Barlow, Ian)
July 10, 2019 Filing 70 ELECTRONIC NOTICE issued requesting courtesy copies for all submissions in opposition to the pending motion for preliminary injunction, including the entries at docket number 64 and 65. The courtesy copies shall be submitted on or before July 16, 2019. The materials should be organized into a binder or binders. The binder should include all documents associated with the opposition, including all memoranda, affidavits/declarations, and exhibits. Documents, including exhibits, should be separated by tabs, be clearly marked with the stamp "Courtesy Copy" on each page, and reflect the document number assigned by CM/ECF. (Halley, Taylor)
June 17, 2019 Filing 67 REPLY to Response to #7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Against Defendants Gotra and Alliance Security filed by Federal Trade Commission. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- Wallace Decl., #2 Exhibit 2 - Howell Depo, #3 Exhibit 3 - Hamrick Depo, #4 Exhibit 4 - Quinn Depo (TransUnion), #5 Exhibit 5 - Cosby Decl. (Equifax), #6 Exhibit 6 - Composite Consumer Exhibit, #7 Exhibit 7 - Sweeney Decl., #8 Exhibit 8 - Email from Defendants' Counsel to FTC, #9 Exhibit 9 - Indiana Judgment, #10 Exhibit 10 - Bankruptcy Court Order, #11 Exhibit 11 - Email from FTC to Defendants, #12 Text of Proposed Order)(Barlow, Ian)
June 14, 2019 Filing 66 Judge George A. O'Toole, Jr: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion #7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Against Defendants Gotra and Alliance Security : Motion Hearing set for 7/24/2019 02:30 PM in Courtroom 22 before Judge George A. O'Toole Jr.(Halley, Taylor)
June 3, 2019 Filing 65 Amended AFFIDAVIT of Matthew Pitts in Opposition re #7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Against Defendants Gotra and Alliance Security filed by Alliance Security Inc., Jasjit Gotra. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit 25, #26 Exhibit 26, #27 Exhibit 27, #28 Exhibit 28, #29 Exhibit 29, #30 Exhibit 30, #31 Exhibit 31, #32 Exhibit 32, #33 Exhibit 34, #34 Exhibit 35)(Atchison, James)
June 3, 2019 Filing 64 Joint Opposition re #7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Against Defendants Gotra and Alliance Security filed by Alliance Security Inc., Jasjit Gotra. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Atchison, James)
May 13, 2019 Filing 63 Judge George A. O'Toole, Jr: ORDER entered. STIPULATED FINAL ORDER FOR PERMANENT INJUNCTION AND CIVIL PENALTY JUDGMENT AS TO DEFENDANTS POWER MARKETING PROMOTIONS AND KEVIN KLINK(Halley, Taylor)
May 13, 2019 Filing 62 Judge George A. O'Toole, Jr: ORDER entered. STIPULATED FINAL ORDER FOR PERMANENT INJUNCTION AND CIVIL PENALTY JUDGMENT AS TO DEFENDANTS DEFEND AMERICA AND JESSICA MERRICK(Halley, Taylor)
May 13, 2019 Filing 61 Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge George A. OToole, Jr: Status Conference held on 5/13/2019 Plaintiff's Motion to Approve Consent Judgment as to Defendants Kevin Klink and Power Marketing Promotions (2) is GRANTED; Plaintiff's Motion to Approve Consent Judgment as to Defendants Jessica Merrick and Defend America LLC (3) is GRANTED; Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time to October 5, 2018 (15) is MOOT; Defendants to file their response to the Motion for Preliminary Injunction due by 6/3/19; Plaintiff to respond to the opposition due by 6/17/19; The court to review Motion to Change Venue(26) and pro se defendant's Motion to Dismiss (33). Those two motions will be taken under advisement. Motions terminated: #57 Joint MOTION to Approve Consent Judgment filed by Kevin Klink, #3 MOTION to Approve Consent Judgment as to Defendants Jessica Merrick and Defend America LLC filed by Federal Trade Commission, #15 MOTION for Extension of Time to October 5, 2018 to File Response/Reply and for Expedited Discovery filed by Alliance Security Inc., Jasjit Gotra, #2 MOTION to Approve Consent Judgment as to Defendants Kevin Klink and Power Marketing Promotions LLC filed by Federal Trade Commission. (Court Reporter: Kathleen Silva at kathysilva@verizon.net.)(Attorneys present: For Plaintiff: Ian Barlow, Tejasvi Srimushnam; For Defendants: Jasjit Gotra ( Pro Se), James Atchison, Geoffrey Aptt) (Lyness, Paul)
May 3, 2019 Filing 60 ELECTRONIC NOTICE OF RESCHEDULING Status Conference set for 5/13/2019 02:00 PM in Courtroom 22 before Judge George A. OToole Jr.. Please make the change in your calendars.(Lyness, Paul)
April 29, 2019 Filing 59 STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report Pursuant to the Court's April 4 Order by Federal Trade Commission. (Barlow, Ian)
April 8, 2019 Filing 58 NOTICE of Appearance by Geoffrey M. Aptt on behalf of Kevin Klink, Power Marketing Promotions LLC (Aptt, Geoffrey)
April 8, 2019 Filing 57 Joint MOTION to Approve Consent Judgment by Kevin Klink. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Aptt, Geoffrey)
April 4, 2019 Filing 56 Set Hearings: Status Conference set for 5/6/2019 02:00 PM in Courtroom 22 before Judge George A. O'Toole Jr. The parties shall file a detailed joint status report no later than seven (7) days before the status conference. To the extent the parties believe that any further scheduling deadlines are necessary, the parties shall propose a joint schedule. (Halley, Taylor)
April 3, 2019 Filing 55 Judge George A. O'Toole, Jr: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #53 First MOTION to Stay re 52 Order on Motion to Stay (Halley, Taylor)
March 1, 2019 Filing 54 NOTICE by Federal Trade Commission Of Amended Motion to Lift Stay (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order To Lift Stay)(Srimushnam, Tejasvi)
February 20, 2019 Filing 53 First MOTION to Stay re 52 Order on Motion to Stay by Federal Trade Commission.(Srimushnam, Tejasvi)
January 2, 2019 Filing 52 Judge George A. OToole, Jr: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #51 Motion to Stay (Lyness, Paul)
December 31, 2018 Filing 51 First MOTION to Stay In Light of United States Government Cessation by Federal Trade Commission.(Srimushnam, Tejasvi)
November 5, 2018 Filing 50 Defendant Jasjit Gotra Response to Plaintiff's Status Report ( Updated) by Jasjit Gotra. (Attachments: #1 Letter, #2 Exhibit) (Halley, Taylor)
November 1, 2018 Filing 49 Defendant Jasjit Gotra Response to Plaintiff's Status Report by Jasjit Gotra. (Halley, Taylor)
October 31, 2018 Filing 48 NOTICE of Appearance by Tejasvi Srimushnam on behalf of Federal Trade Commission (Srimushnam, Tejasvi)
October 30, 2018 Filing 47 NOTICE by Federal Trade Commission re #7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Against Defendants Gotra and Alliance Security Updated Status Report Regarding Motion for Preliminary Injunction Against Individual Defendant Jasjit Gotra (Barlow, Ian)
October 25, 2018 Filing 46 Response by Alliance Security Inc. to #43 Status Report . (Atchison, James)
October 12, 2018 Filing 45 ELECTRONIC NOTICE issued requesting courtesy copies for all submissions relating to the pending motions. The courtesy copies shall be submitted on or before October 26, 2018. The parties should confer and submit one set of courtesy copies. Each motion should be organized in binder(s). The binder should include all documents associated with each motion, including all memoranda, affidavits/declarations, and exhibits in support of and in opposition to the motion. Documents, including exhibits, should be separated by tabs, be clearly marked with the stamp "Courtesy Copy" on each page, and reflect the document number assigned by CM/ECF. (Halley, Taylor)
October 11, 2018 Filing 44 REPLY to Response to #15 MOTION for Extension of Time to October 5, 2018 to File Response/Reply and for Expedited Discovery with certificate of service filed by Alliance Security Inc., Jasjit Gotra. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Matthew Pitts, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 4 (continued), #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit 9, #12 Exhibit 10, #13 Exhibit 11, #14 Exhibit 12, #15 Exhibit 13, #16 Exhibit 14, #17 Exhibit 15, #18 Exhibit 16, #19 Exhibit 17, #20 Exhibit 17 (continued), #21 Exhibit 18, #22 Exhibit 19, #23 Exhibit 20, #24 Exhibit 21, #25 Exhibit 22, #26 Exhibit 23, #27 Exhibit 24, #28 Exhibit 25, #29 Exhibit 26, #30 Exhibit 27, #31 Exhibit 28, #32 Exhibit 28 (continued, #33 Exhibit 29, #34 Exhibit 30, #35 Exhibit 31, #36 Exhibit 32, #37 Exhibit 33, #38 Exhibit 34, #39 Exhibit 35, #40 Exhibit 36, #41 Exhibit 36 (continued), #42 Exhibit B, #43 Exhibit C, #44 Exhibit D)(Atchison, James)
October 10, 2018 Filing 43 STATUS REPORT on FTC Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Request for a Decision or Hearing by Federal Trade Commission. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Barlow, Ian)
October 10, 2018 Filing 42 SUR-REPLY to Motion re #15 MOTION for Extension of Time to October 5, 2018 to File Response/Reply and for Expedited Discovery SUR-REPLY IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR A SIX-MONTH EXTENSION TO OPPOSE THE FTCS MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION AND DEFENDANTS REQUEST FOR SIX MONTHS OF EXPEDITED DISCOVERY filed by Federal Trade Commission. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(Estrada, Danielle)
October 9, 2018 Filing 41 Judge George A. O'Toole, Jr: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #35 Motion for Leave to File Document ; Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. (Halley, Taylor)
October 9, 2018 Filing 40 Judge George A. OToole, Jr: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #32 Motion for Leave to File Document ; Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. (Halley, Taylor)
June 8, 2018 Filing 39 JOINT SUBMISSION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 and report on the parties' Rule 26(f) conference by Federal Trade Commission.(Barlow, Ian)
June 5, 2018 Filing 38 NOTICE of Appearance by Dean J. Wagner on behalf of Alliance Security Inc. (Wagner, Dean)
May 24, 2018 Filing 37 Opposition re #33 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Federal Trade Commission. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Estrada, Danielle)
May 21, 2018 Filing 36 NOTICE by Federal Trade Commission of Related Case involving Ricardo Diaz, the CFO of Defendant Alliance Security (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Complaint from FTC v. Pointbreak Media LLC, #2 Exhibit TRO entered in FTC v. Pointbreak Media LLC)(Barlow, Ian)
May 17, 2018 Filing 35 Consent MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply in further opposition to Defendants Motion for a Six Month Extension (ECF 15) to Oppose the FTCs Motion for Preliminary Injunction (ECF 7) by Federal Trade Commission. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Sur-Reply, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5)(Estrada, Danielle)
May 14, 2018 Filing 34 MEMORANDUM in Support re #33 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Jasjit Gotra. (Halley, Taylor)
May 14, 2018 Filing 33 Defendant Jasit Gotra's MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint by Jasjit Gotra.(Halley, Taylor)
May 4, 2018 Filing 32 MOTION for Leave to File Reply in Support of Motion For Enlargement Of Time And Request For Expedited Discovery by Alliance Security Inc., Jasjit Gotra. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Reply, #2 Exhibit A - Declaration of M. Pitts, #3 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of M. Pitts, #4 Exhibit 2 to Declaration of M. Pitts, #5 Exhibit 3 to Declaration of M. Pitts, #6 Exhibit 4 to Declaration of M. Pitts, #7 Exhibit 4 (continued) to Declaration of M. Pitts, #8 Exhibit 5 to Declaration of M. Pitts, #9 Exhibit 6 to Declaration of M. Pitts, #10 Exhibit 7 to Declaration of M. Pitts, #11 Exhibit 8 to Declaration of M. Pitts, #12 Exhibit 9 to Declaration of M. Pitts, #13 Exhibit 10 to Declaration of M. Pitts, #14 Exhibit 11 to Declaration of M. Pitts, #15 Exhibit 12 to Declaration of M. Pitts, #16 Exhibit 12 (continued) to Declaration of M. Pitts, #17 Exhibit 13 to Declaration of M. Pitts, #18 Exhibit 14 to Declaration of M. Pitts, #19 Exhibit 15 to Declaration of M. Pitts, #20 Exhibit 16 to Declaration of M. Pitts, #21 Exhibit 17 to Declaration of M. Pitts, #22 Exhibit 17 (continued) to Declaration of M. Pitts, #23 Exhibit 18 to Declaration of M. Pitts, #24 Exhibit 19 to Declaration of M. Pitts, #25 Exhibit 20 to Declaration of M. Pitts, #26 Exhibit 21 to Declaration of M. Pitts, #27 Exhibit 22 to Declaration of M. Pitts, #28 Exhibit 23 to Declaration of M. Pitts, #29 Exhibit 24 to Declaration of M. Pitts, #30 Exhibit 24 (continued) to Declaration of M. Pitts, #31 Exhibit 25 to Declaration of M. Pitts, #32 Exhibit 26 to Declaration of M. Pitts, #33 Exhibit 27 to Declaration of M. Pitts, #34 Exhibit 28 to Declaration of M. Pitts, #35 Exhibit 28 (continued) to Declaration of M. Pitts, #36 Exhibit 29 to Declaration of M. Pitts, #37 Exhibit 30 to Declaration of M. Pitts, #38 Exhibit 31 to Declaration of M. Pitts, #39 Exhibit 32 to Declaration of M. Pitts, #40 Exhibit 33 to Declaration of M. Pitts, #41 Exhibit 34 to Declaration of M. Pitts, #42 Exhibit 35 to Declaration of M. Pitts, #43 Exhibit 36 to Declaration of M. Pitts, #44 Exhibit 36 to Declaration of M. Pitts, #45 Exhibit B, #46 Exhibit C, #47 Exhibit D)(Atchison, James)
April 30, 2018 Filing 31 Opposition re #26 Amended MOTION to Change Venue for Convenience filed by Federal Trade Commission. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Third Declaration of Darren Wright, #2 Exhibit Declaration of Tyler Hall, Partially Unredacted)(Barlow, Ian)
April 24, 2018 Filing 30 Judge George A. O'Toole, Jr: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered GRANTING #22 Motion to Extend Time to Answer, Move, or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint; DENYING without prejudice #29 Request for Clerk's Entry of Default; and finding as MOOT #24 Motion for Change of Venue in light of the filing of an amended motion. The deadline for Gotra to answer or otherwise respond to the plaintiff's complaint is May 14, 2018. (Halley, Taylor)
April 23, 2018 Filing 29 Request for notice of default by Federal Trade Commission Request for Clerk's Entry of Default as to Defendant Gotra. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Affidavit of Service))(Estrada, Danielle)
April 20, 2018 Filing 28 Opposition re #22 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Federal Trade Commission. (Attachments: #1 Ex. 1 - FTC Email to Venable LLP dated June 30, 2018, #2 Ex. 2 - FTC email to Venable LLP dated Feb. 26, 2018, #3 Ex. 3 - Email exchange between FTC and Defendant Gotra dated April 12, 2018, #4 Ex. 4 - Declaration of FTC Investigator Wright, #5 Ex. 5 - Declaration of Consumer)(Barlow, Ian)
April 19, 2018 Filing 27 Opposition re #15 MOTION for Extension of Time to October 5, 2018 to File Response/Reply and for Expedited Discovery filed by Federal Trade Commission. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Supp. Declaration of FTC Investigator Darren Wright, #2 Exhibit Declaration of Consumer Robert Smithwick, #3 Exhibit Notarized letter from RI Asst. AG, #4 Exhibit Declaration of Consumer Justin Trent)(Barlow, Ian)
April 16, 2018 Filing 26 Amended MOTION to Change Venue by Alliance Security Inc..(Atchison, James)
April 16, 2018 Filing 25 MEMORANDUM in Support re #24 MOTION to Change Venue filed by Alliance Security Inc.. (Atchison, James)
April 16, 2018 Filing 24 MOTION to Change Venue by Alliance Security Inc..(Atchison, James)
April 13, 2018 Filing 23 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Alliance Security Inc..(Atchison, James)
April 13, 2018 Filing 22 MOTION for Extension of Time to 05/14/2018 to File Answer by Jasjit Gotra.(Halley, Taylor)
April 9, 2018 Filing 21 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed by Federal Trade Commission. Power Marketing Promotions LLC served on 3/23/2018, answer due 4/13/2018. Acknowledgment filed by Federal Trade Commission. (Barlow, Ian)
April 9, 2018 Filing 20 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed by Federal Trade Commission. Kevin Klink served on 3/23/2018, answer due 4/13/2018. Acknowledgment filed by Federal Trade Commission. (Barlow, Ian)
April 9, 2018 Filing 19 SUMMONS Returned Executed Defend America LLC served on 4/3/2018, answer due 4/24/2018. (Barlow, Ian)
April 9, 2018 Filing 18 SUMMONS Returned Executed Jessica Merrick served on 4/2/2018, answer due 4/23/2018. (Barlow, Ian)
April 6, 2018 Filing 17 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Alliance Security Inc.. (Atchison, James)
April 5, 2018 Filing 16 MEMORANDUM in Support re #15 MOTION for Extension of Time to October 5, 2018 to File Response/Reply and for Expedited Discovery filed by Alliance Security Inc., Jasjit Gotra. (Atchison, James)
April 5, 2018 Filing 15 MOTION for Extension of Time to October 5, 2018 to File Response/Reply and for Expedited Discovery by Alliance Security Inc., Jasjit Gotra.(Atchison, James)
March 28, 2018 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by James G. Atchison on behalf of Alliance Security Inc. (Atchison, James)
March 28, 2018 Filing 13 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed by Federal Trade Commission. Alliance Security Inc. served on 3/23/2018, answer due 4/13/2018. Acknowledgment filed by Federal Trade Commission. (Estrada, Danielle)
March 27, 2018 Filing 12 Judge George A. O'Toole, Jr: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #6 Motion for Leave to File 30-Page Memorandum of Law (Halley, Taylor)
March 27, 2018 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT of James G. Atchison, Esquire re #1 Complaint, by Alliance Security Inc.. (Atchison, James)
March 26, 2018 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed Jasjit Gotra served on 3/23/2018, answer due 4/13/2018. (Estrada, Danielle)
March 23, 2018 Filing 9 Supplemental MEMORANDUM in Support re #7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Against Defendants Gotra and Alliance Security to Attach Additional Exhibits filed by Federal Trade Commission. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of FTC Investigator Darren Wright, #2 Wright Dec. Att. A, #3 Wright Dec. Att. B, #4 Wright Dec. Att. C, #5 Wright Dec. Att. D, #6 Wright Dec. Att. E, #7 Wright Dec. Att. F, #8 Wright Dec. Att. G, #9 Wright Dec. Att. H, #10 Wright Dec. Att. I, #11 Wright Dec. Att. J, #12 Wright Dec. Att. K, #13 Wright Dec. Att. L, #14 Wright Dec. Att. M, #15 Wright Dec. Att. N, #16 Wright Dec. Att. O, #17 Wright Dec. Att. P, #18 Wright Dec. Att. Q, #19 Wright Dec. Att. R, #20 Wright Dec. Att. S, #21 Wright Dec. Att. T, #22 Wright Dec. Att. U, #23 Wright Dec. Att. V, #24 Wright Dec. Att. W, #25 Wright Dec. Att. X, #26 Wright Dec. Att. Y)(Barlow, Ian)
March 23, 2018 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM in Support re #7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Against Defendants Gotra and Alliance Security filed by Federal Trade Commission. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit, #15 Exhibit, #16 Exhibit, #17 Exhibit, #18 Exhibit, #19 Exhibit, #20 Exhibit, #21 Exhibit, #22 Exhibit, #23 Exhibit, #24 Exhibit, #25 Exhibit, #26 Exhibit, #27 Exhibit)(Barlow, Ian)
March 23, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Against Defendants Gotra and Alliance Security by Federal Trade Commission. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order for Preliminary Injunction Against Defendants Gotra and Alliance Security)(Barlow, Ian)
March 22, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to File 30-Page Memorandum of Law by Federal Trade Commission. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Leave to File 30 Page Memorandum of Law)(Barlow, Ian)
March 22, 2018 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Alliance Security Inc., Defend America LLC, Jasjit Gotra, Kevin Klink, Jessica Merrick, Power Marketing Promotions LLC. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Coppola, Katelyn)
March 22, 2018 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge George A. OToole, Jr assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler. (Pacho, Arnold)
March 22, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION to Approve Consent Judgment as to Defendants Jessica Merrick and Defend America LLC by Federal Trade Commission. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Stipulated Final Order as to Defendants Jessica Merrick and Defend America LLC)(Barlow, Ian)
March 22, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION to Approve Consent Judgment as to Defendants Kevin Klink and Power Marketing Promotions LLC by Federal Trade Commission. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Stipulated Final Order as to Defendants Kevin Klink and Power Marketing Promotions LLC)(Barlow, Ian)
March 22, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Fee Status: US Government), filed by Federal Trade Commission. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Estrada, Danielle) (Main Document 1 replaced on 3/22/2018) (Coppola, Katelyn). (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/22/2018: #2 Exhibit) (Coppola, Katelyn). (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/4/2018: #3 Category sheet) (Coppola, Katelyn).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Federal Trade Commission v. Gotra et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jessica Merrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alliance Security, Inc.
Represented By: James G. Atchison
Represented By: Dean J. Wagner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jessica Bright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Power Marketing Promotions LLC
Represented By: Geoffrey M. Aptt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Defend America LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jessica Dudlicek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jasjit Gotra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Klink
Represented By: Geoffrey M. Aptt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Federal Trade Commission
Represented By: Tejasvi Srimushnam
Represented By: Ian L. Barlow
Represented By: Danielle M. Estrada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?