Oliver v. Providence Water Supply Board et al
Plaintiff: Charlene Oliver
Defendant: Providence Water Supply Board, City of Providence, by and through its Treasurer, James J. Lombardi, III and City of Providence
Case Number: 1:2019cv00415
Filed: August 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: Lincoln D Almond
Referring Judge: William E Smith
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Factual Discovery to be completed by 6/26/2020; Dispositive Motions to be filed by 7/24/2020; Any Expert Discovery to be completed by 7/24/20; Pretrial Memorandum due 30 days after decision on any pending motions, or if no motions are pending, by 7/24/2020. So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 9/24/2019. (Jackson, Ryan)
September 24, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge William E. Smith: Telephonic Rule 16 Conference held on 9/24/2019; counsel present: N. Policastro; M. Reeber. (Jackson, Ryan)
September 23, 2019 Filing 11 STIPULATION filed by Charlene Oliver. (Pushee, Michael)
September 20, 2019 Filing 10 RULE 16 STATEMENT by Charlene Oliver. (Formisano, V.)
September 18, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Hearing: Telephonic Rule 16 Conference scheduled for Tuesday 9/24/2019 at 11:00 AM before Chief Judge William E. Smith. The Court will initiate the call. Counsel shall provide Case Manager Ryan Jackson with a direct-dial phone number, via email, at least 24-hours prior to the conference. (Jackson, Ryan)
September 18, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER: Pursuant to Rule 26 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the parties are directed to begin their mandatory disclosures immediately, before the Rule 16 conference. To the extent that the parties wish to begin discovery on a cooperative basis prior to the initial conference, they are encouraged to do so. So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 9/18/2019. (Jackson, Ryan)
August 20, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint by City of Providence, Providence Water Supply Board.(Reeber, Matthew)
August 8, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Charlene Oliver. City of Providence served on 8/7/2019, answer due 8/28/2019. (Formisano, V.)
August 8, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Charlene Oliver. Providence Water Supply Board served on 8/7/2019, answer due 8/28/2019. (Formisano, V.)
August 5, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to City of Providence, Providence Water Supply Board. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Potter, Carrie)
August 5, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Request filed by Charlene Oliver. (Formisano, V.)
August 5, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Request filed by Charlene Oliver. (Formisano, V.)
August 5, 2019 Filing 2 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Potter, Carrie)
August 5, 2019 Case assigned to Chief Judge William E. Smith and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Potter, Carrie)
August 2, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1403593 ), filed by Charlene Oliver. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Formisano, V.)
August 2, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1403593 ), filed by Charlene Oliver. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Formisano, V.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Oliver v. Providence Water Supply Board et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Providence Water Supply Board
Represented By: Matthew C. Reeber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Providence, by and through its Treasurer, James J. Lombardi, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Providence
Represented By: Matthew C. Reeber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charlene Oliver
Represented By: V. Edward Formisano
Represented By: Nicole J. Policastro
Represented By: Michael D. Pushee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?