Berkshire Place Associates LP et al v. MDG Real Estate Global Limited et al
Plaintiff: Berkshire Place, Ltd. and Berkshire Place Associates, LP
Defendant: Riverside Abstract, LLC, MDG Real Estate Global, LLC and MDG Real Estate Global Limited
Case Number: 1:2019cv00432
Filed: August 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: Lincoln D Almond
Referring Judge: Mary S McElroy
2 Judge: William E Smith
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 31, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 10, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER: This matter is hereby transferred to the calendar of District Judge Mary S. McElroy for all further proceedings. Chief Judge William E. Smith no longer assigned to case. So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 10/10/2019. (Jackson, Ryan)
September 17, 2019 Filing 11 REPLY to Response re #10 Response to Motion, REPLY BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION AWARD filed by Berkshire Place Associates, LP, Berkshire Place, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Carter, Nicholas)
September 11, 2019 Filing 10 RESPONSE In Opposition to #9 MOTION Plaintiffs Motion to Confirm Arbitration Award filed by MDG Real Estate Global Limited, MDG Real Estate Global, LLC. Replies due by 9/18/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, Memorandum, #2 Exhibit B, Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #3 Exhibit C, Case Detail Sheet, #4 Exhibit D, Decision and Order)(Brenner, Jeffrey)
August 28, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION Plaintiffs Motion to Confirm Arbitration Award filed by Berkshire Place Associates, LP, Berkshire Place, Ltd.. Responses due by 9/11/2019. (Carter, Nicholas)
August 27, 2019 Filing 8 STATE COURT RECORD received electronically from the State of Rhode Island. (Attachments: #1 State Record Part B)(Potter, Carrie)
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Nicholas B Carter ; granting #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Suzanne Elovecky. So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 8/27/2019. (Potter, Carrie)
August 27, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Suzanne Elovecky to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 100.00, receipt number 0103-1410090 ) filed by Berkshire Place Associates, LP, Berkshire Place, Ltd.. (McHugh, Kevin)
August 27, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Nicholas B. Carter to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 100.00, receipt number 0103-1410088 ) filed by Berkshire Place Associates, LP, Berkshire Place, Ltd.. (McHugh, Kevin)
August 27, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin F. McHugh on behalf of Berkshire Place Associates, LP, Berkshire Place, Ltd. (McHugh, Kevin)
August 27, 2019 Filing 4 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Perry, Frank)
August 26, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by MDG Real Estate Global, LLC. (Brenner, Jeffrey)
August 26, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by MDG Real Estate Global Limited. (Brenner, Jeffrey)
August 14, 2019 Case assigned to Chief Judge William E. Smith and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Farrell Pletcher, Paula)
August 14, 2019 Filing 1 NEW CASE/NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Providence County Superior Court, Case Number PM-2019-7318. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0103-1406364, filed by MDG Real Estate Global, LLC, MDG Real Estate Global Limited. (Attachments: #1 Complaint in case being removed (Ex. A Part 1), #2 Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #3 Exhibit A- Part 2, #4 Exhibit A- Part 3, #5 Exhibit A-Part 4, #6 Exhibit A-Part 5, #7 Exhibit A-Part 6, #8 Civil Cover Sheet)(Brenner, Jeffrey)
August 14, 2019 Case assigned to Chief Judge William E. Smith and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Farrell Pletcher, Paula)
August 14, 2019 Filing 1 NEW CASE/NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Providence County Superior Court, Case Number PM-2019-7318. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0103-1406364, filed by MDG Real Estate Global, LLC, MDG Real Estate Global Limited. (Attachments: #1 Complaint in case being removed (Ex. A Part 1), #2 Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #3 Exhibit A- Part 2, #4 Exhibit A- Part 3, #5 Exhibit A-Part 4, #6 Exhibit A-Part 5, #7 Exhibit A-Part 6, #8 Civil Cover Sheet)(Brenner, Jeffrey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Berkshire Place Associates LP et al v. MDG Real Estate Global Limited et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Riverside Abstract, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MDG Real Estate Global, LLC
Represented By: Jeffrey S. Brenner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MDG Real Estate Global Limited
Represented By: Jeffrey S. Brenner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Berkshire Place, Ltd.
Represented By: Carl B. Lisa
Represented By: Kevin F. McHugh
Represented By: Nicholas B Carter
Represented By: Suzanne Elovecky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Berkshire Place Associates, LP
Represented By: Carl B. Lisa
Represented By: Kevin F. McHugh
Represented By: Nicholas B Carter
Represented By: Suzanne Elovecky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?