Gavel v. The One, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Shannon Gavel
Defendant: Atwells Realty Corp., Gerard Disanto II, Madeline DiSanto and The One, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00433
Filed: August 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: Lincoln D Almond
Referring Judge: John J McConnell
2 Judge: Mary S McElroy
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 9, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER: This case is transferred to the calendar of Judge Mary S. McElroy - So Ordered by District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 10/9/2019. (Barletta, Barbara)
October 9, 2019 Case reassigned to District Judge Mary S. McElroy. District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. no longer assigned to the case. (Barletta, Barbara)
October 1, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , MOTION to Compel Arbitration filed by All Defendants. Responses due by 10/15/2019. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Memorandum, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(Nicholson, Richard)
October 1, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by All Defendants. Responses due by 10/15/2019. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Memorandum)(Nicholson, Richard)
September 19, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #11 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Ved Chitale. So Ordered by District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 9/19/2019. (Potter, Carrie)
September 18, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Ved Chitale to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 100.00, receipt number 0103-1416962 ) filed by All Plaintiffs. (Enright, Thomas)
September 12, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Shannon Gavel. Gerard Disanto II served on 9/10/2019, answer due 10/1/2019. (Assaad, Gabriel)
September 12, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Shannon Gavel. Madeline DiSanto served on 9/10/2019, answer due 10/1/2019. (Assaad, Gabriel)
September 12, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Shannon Gavel. The One, Inc. served on 9/10/2019, answer due 10/1/2019. (Assaad, Gabriel)
September 12, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Shannon Gavel. Atwells Realty Corp. served on 9/10/2019, answer due 10/1/2019. (Assaad, Gabriel)
August 30, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Request filed by Shannon Gavel. (Assaad, Gabriel)
August 14, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Atwells Realty Corp., Madeline DiSanto, Gerard Disanto II, The One, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(Simoncelli, Michael)
August 14, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Atwells Realty Corp., Madeline DiSanto, Gerard Disanto II, The One, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(Simoncelli, Michael)
August 14, 2019 Filing 4 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Simoncelli, Michael)
August 14, 2019 Filing 4 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Simoncelli, Michael)
August 14, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Gabriel A. Assaad to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 100.00, receipt number 0103-1406428 ) filed by Shannon Gavel. (Enright, Thomas)
August 14, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Gabriel A. Assaad to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 100.00, receipt number 0103-1406428 ) filed by Shannon Gavel. (Enright, Thomas)
August 14, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for David Hodges to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 100.00, receipt number 0103-1406427 ) filed by Shannon Gavel. (Enright, Thomas)
August 14, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for David Hodges to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 100.00, receipt number 0103-1406427 ) filed by Shannon Gavel. (Enright, Thomas)
August 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1406418 ), filed by Shannon Gavel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons)(Enright, Thomas)
August 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1406418 ), filed by Shannon Gavel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons)(Enright, Thomas)
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #2 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of David W. Hodges. So Ordered by District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 8/14/2019. (Simoncelli, Michael)
August 14, 2019 Case assigned to District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Simoncelli, Michael)
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #3 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Gabriel A. Assaad. So Ordered by District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 8/14/2019. (Simoncelli, Michael)
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #2 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of David W. Hodges. So Ordered by District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 8/14/2019. (Simoncelli, Michael)
August 14, 2019 Case assigned to District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Simoncelli, Michael)
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #3 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Gabriel A. Assaad. So Ordered by District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 8/14/2019. (Simoncelli, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gavel v. The One, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Atwells Realty Corp.
Represented By: Richard W. Nicholson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gerard Disanto II
Represented By: Richard W. Nicholson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Madeline DiSanto
Represented By: Richard W. Nicholson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The One, Inc.
Represented By: Richard W. Nicholson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shannon Gavel
Represented By: Gabriel A. Assaad
Represented By: Thomas J Enright
Represented By: David W. Hodges
Represented By: Ved Chitale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?