Brownell v. Coyne-Fague et al
Plaintiff: Brian Brownell
Defendant: Rhode Island Department of Corrections, Pauline Marcussen, Brian Hayes, Jennifer Clarke, Kathy Lyons, Patricia A. Coyne-Fague, Rui Duniz and Lynda Aul
Case Number: 1:2019cv00440
Filed: August 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: Lincoln D Almond
Referring Judge: William E Smith
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 26, 2019 Filing 16 Letter from Brian Brownell. Docket Sheet mailed on 9/26/2019. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (Potter, Carrie)
September 25, 2019 Filing 15 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Rhode Island Department of Corrections. Rhode Island Department of Corrections waiver sent on 9/25/2019, answer due 11/25/2019. (Roach, Adam)
September 25, 2019 Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Patricia A. Coyne-Fague. Patricia A. Coyne-Fague waiver sent on 9/25/2019, answer due 11/25/2019. (Roach, Adam)
September 25, 2019 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Pauline Marcussen. Pauline Marcussen waiver sent on 9/25/2019, answer due 11/25/2019. (Roach, Adam)
September 25, 2019 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Kathy Lyons. Kathy Lyons waiver sent on 9/25/2019, answer due 11/25/2019. (Roach, Adam)
September 25, 2019 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Brian Hayes. Brian Hayes waiver sent on 9/25/2019, answer due 11/25/2019. (Roach, Adam)
September 25, 2019 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Rui Duniz. Rui Duniz waiver sent on 9/25/2019, answer due 11/25/2019. (Roach, Adam)
September 25, 2019 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Jennifer Clarke. Jennifer Clarke waiver sent on 9/25/2019, answer due 11/25/2019. (Roach, Adam)
September 25, 2019 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Lynda Aul. Lynda Aul waiver sent on 9/25/2019, answer due 11/25/2019. (Roach, Adam)
September 18, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM WITH SUPPORTING MEMORANDUM filed by Jennifer Clarke. Responses due by 10/2/2019. (Latham, Jeffrey)
September 12, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Christine A. Stowell on behalf of Jennifer Clarke (Stowell, Christine)
September 12, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey G. Latham on behalf of Jennifer Clarke (Latham, Jeffrey)
August 26, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF SERVICE: The Court has granted IFP status and ordered the complaint to be served. Pursuant to the Agreement on Service between the U.S. District Court for the District of Rhode Island and the Rhode Island Attorney General, this Notice constitutes service as directed by the Court. Within 30 days, the RI Attorney General shall file a Notice of Acceptance of Service or a Notice of Declination of Service or both if necessary on behalf of the defendant(s) named in the complaint. # Please click here to access the Acceptance of Service form or # Please click here to access the Declination of Service form .Notice of Acceptance or Declination of Service due by 9/25/2019. (Potter, Carrie)
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; denying #3 Motion to Appoint Counsel. DENIED without prejudice to refiling at a later stage in the proceedings. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond on 8/26/2019. (Saucier, Martha)
August 21, 2019 MOTIONS REFERRED: #3 MOTION to Appoint Counsel, #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis referred for determination to Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Urizandi, Nisshy)
August 20, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Brian Brownell. Responses due by 9/3/2019. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(Potter, Carrie)
August 20, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Brian Brownell. (Attachments: #1 IFP Short Form, #2 Inmate Account Form, #3 Account Summary)(Potter, Carrie)
August 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, filed by Brian Brownell. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Attachment A, #3 Communication Timeline, #4 Timeline Overview, #5 Exhibit, #6 Regulations, #7 Summonses)(Potter, Carrie)
August 20, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Brian Brownell. Responses due by 9/3/2019. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(Potter, Carrie)
August 20, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Brian Brownell. (Attachments: #1 IFP Short Form, #2 Inmate Account Form, #3 Account Summary)(Potter, Carrie)
August 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, filed by Brian Brownell. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Attachment A, #3 Communication Timeline, #4 Timeline Overview, #5 Exhibit, #6 Regulations, #7 Summonses)(Potter, Carrie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brownell v. Coyne-Fague et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rhode Island Department of Corrections
Represented By: Adam D. Roach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pauline Marcussen
Represented By: Adam D. Roach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Hayes
Represented By: Adam D. Roach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer Clarke
Represented By: Adam D. Roach
Represented By: Christine A. Stowell
Represented By: Jeffrey G. Latham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathy Lyons
Represented By: Adam D. Roach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patricia A. Coyne-Fague
Represented By: Adam D. Roach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rui Duniz
Represented By: Adam D. Roach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lynda Aul
Represented By: Adam D. Roach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Brownell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?