Lee v. New England Boatworks, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Abraham F. Lee
Defendant: Steve Casella, New England Boatworks, Inc., David McBain and Tom Rich
Case Number: 1:2019cv00455
Filed: August 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: John J McConnell
Referring Judge: Patricia A Sullivan
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 21, 2019 NOTICE of Hearing: Telephonic Rule 16 Conference set for Friday, 11/8/2019 at 09:00 AM before District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. The Court will initiate the call. Counsel shall provide the Clerk with contact information if it differs from the docket sheet (Barletta, Barbara)
September 27, 2019 Filing 10 Defendants New England Boatworks, Inc., Tom Rich, Steve Casella and David Macbain's ANSWER to Complaint by Steve Casella, David McBain, New England Boatworks, Inc., Tom Rich.(Caletri, John)
September 27, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by John A. Caletri on behalf of All Defendants (Caletri, John)
September 23, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Abraham F. Lee. All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Supplement, #2 Supplement, #3 Supplement)(Ellermann, Vanessa)
September 10, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Steve Casella, David McBain, New England Boatworks, Inc., Tom Rich. (Attachments: #1 Casella Summons, #2 McBain Summons, #3 Rich Summons)(Farrell Pletcher, Paula)
September 9, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Request filed by Abraham F. Lee. (Attachments: #1 SummonsCasella, #2 SummonsMacBain, #3 SummonsRich)(Ellermann, Vanessa)
August 28, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(McGuire, Vickie)
August 28, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Request filed by Abraham F. Lee. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Co-defendant summons, #2 Supplement Co-defendant summons, #3 Supplement Co-defendant summons)(Ellermann, Vanessa)
August 28, 2019 Filing 3 EXHIBIT IN SUPPORT by Abraham F. Lee in support of #1 Complaint . (Ellermann, Vanessa)
August 28, 2019 Filing 2 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Potter, Carrie)
August 28, 2019 Case assigned to District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (Potter, Carrie)
August 28, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1410759 ), filed by Abraham F. Lee. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Ellermann, Vanessa)
August 28, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(McGuire, Vickie)
August 28, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Request filed by Abraham F. Lee. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Co-defendant summons, #2 Supplement Co-defendant summons, #3 Supplement Co-defendant summons)(Ellermann, Vanessa)
August 28, 2019 Filing 3 EXHIBIT IN SUPPORT by Abraham F. Lee in support of #1 Complaint . (Ellermann, Vanessa)
August 28, 2019 Filing 2 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Potter, Carrie)
August 28, 2019 Case assigned to District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (Potter, Carrie)
August 28, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1410759 ), filed by Abraham F. Lee. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Ellermann, Vanessa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lee v. New England Boatworks, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Casella
Represented By: John A. Caletri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New England Boatworks, Inc.
Represented By: John A. Caletri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David McBain
Represented By: John A. Caletri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tom Rich
Represented By: John A. Caletri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Abraham F. Lee
Represented By: Vanessa G. Ellermann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?