Silvia v. Remy
Plaintiff: David A. Silvia
Defendant: Robin Remy
Case Number: 1:2019cv00459
Filed: September 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: Lincoln D Almond
Referring Judge: John J McConnell
Nature of Suit: State Reapportionment
Cause of Action: 28:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 28, 2019 Filing 5 Plaintiff's Memorandum to the Court by David A. Silvia (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(Potter, Carrie)
September 11, 2019 Filing 4 Pro Se Consent to Receive Documents Electronically filed by David A. Silvia. (Potter, Carrie)
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #3 Motion to Amend/Correct - So Ordered by District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 9/11/2019. (Urizandi, Nisshy)
September 9, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Amend/Correct filed by David A. Silvia. Responses due by 9/23/2019. (McGuire, Vickie)
September 4, 2019 Summons Issued as to Robin Remy. Summons and USM-285 Form forwarded to the US Marshal Service for service of process. (Potter, Carrie)
September 4, 2019 CASE PERMANENTLY ASSIGNED Since District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. has determined that this case is in fact related to CA 19-cv-142-JJM-LDA this case is permanently assigned to District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. for all further proceedings (Urizandi, Nisshy)
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis - So Ordered by District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 9/4/2019. (Urizandi, Nisshy)
September 3, 2019 Notice of Availability to Receive Documents Electronically. Pro Se litigants are encouraged to review the details of the Consent & Registration Form and if interested, complete the Registration Form and return it to the Clerks Office. Click # here to access the form. (Potter, Carrie)
September 3, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by David A. Silvia. (Potter, Carrie)
September 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by David A. Silvia. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons and USM-285 Form, #3 Envelope)(Potter, Carrie)
September 3, 2019 CASE CONDITIONALLY ASSIGNED to District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. Related Case Number 19-cv-142-JJM-LDA based upon the indication on the cover sheet that a related case previously was assigned to the presiding judge. The assignment is subject to the presiding judge's determination that the cases, in fact, are related. (Potter, Carrie)
September 3, 2019 Notice of Availability to Receive Documents Electronically. Pro Se litigants are encouraged to review the details of the Consent & Registration Form and if interested, complete the Registration Form and return it to the Clerks Office. Click # here to access the form. (Potter, Carrie)
September 3, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by David A. Silvia. (Potter, Carrie)
September 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by David A. Silvia. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons and USM-285 Form, #3 Envelope)(Potter, Carrie)
September 3, 2019 CASE CONDITIONALLY ASSIGNED to District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. Related Case Number 19-cv-142-JJM-LDA based upon the indication on the cover sheet that a related case previously was assigned to the presiding judge. The assignment is subject to the presiding judge's determination that the cases, in fact, are related. (Potter, Carrie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Silvia v. Remy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David A. Silvia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robin Remy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?