Saltzman v. Davison
Plaintiff: Robert B Saltzman
Defendant: Simon Davison
Case Number: 1:2019cv00463
Filed: September 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 24, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Maurice Joseph Cusick on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Cusick, Maurice)
October 22, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting in part and denying in part #6 Motion to Consolidate Cases. Based on the parties partial agreement and the Courts discretion pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 42, Defendants motion to consolidate (ECF No. 6) is granted in part and denied in part. The Court grants the motion to the extent that it requests consolidation for discovery, so this matter is hereby consolidated only for discovery purposes with Saltzman v. Whisper Yacht Ltd., 19-285MSM; and the Court denies the motion without prejudice insofar as it requests consolidation for trial, which the parties may wish to raise during the pretrial conference. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan on 10/22/2019. (Saucier, Martha)
October 11, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan: Motion Hearing held on 10/11/2019 re (18 in 1:19-cv-00285-MSM-PAS) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM or in the alternative Motion for partial summary judgment filed by Whisper Yacht, Ltd., s/y Whisper, (6 in 1:19-cv-00463-MSM-PAS) MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by Simon Davison, (20 in 1:19-cv-00285-MSM-PAS) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM or in the Motion for partial summary judgment filed by Churchill Yacht Partners, LLC, Whisper Yacht (USA), LLC, (33 in 1:19-cv-00285-MSM-PAS) MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by Whisper Yacht, Ltd., s/y Whisper, Churchill Yacht Partners, LLC, Whisper Yacht (USA), LLC. John Fulweiler and Maurice Cusick for the plaintiff; Kirby Aarsheim and David Farrell for the defendants; Both sides argue; Court to issue a report and recommendation on pending motions to dismiss; Court takes motion to consolidate under advisement. (Court Reporter FTR-Recording in Courtroom B at 2:04.) (Saucier, Martha)
October 9, 2019 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion (18 in 1:19-cv-00285-MSM-PAS) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM or in the alternative Motion for partial summary judgment, (33 in 1:19-cv-00285-MSM-PAS) MOTION to Consolidate Cases , (20 in 1:19-cv-00285-MSM-PAS) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM or in the Motion for partial summary judgment, (6 in 1:19-cv-00463-MSM-PAS) MOTION to Consolidate Cases : Motion Hearing set for 10/11/2019 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom B before Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. Please note the addition of motions to consolidate Cases.(Saucier, Martha)
October 8, 2019 Case reassigned to District Judge Mary S. McElroy. District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. no longer assigned to the case. (Barletta, Barbara)
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER: This case is transferred to the calendar of Judge Mary S. McElroy - So Ordered by District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 10/8/2019. (Barletta, Barbara)
October 7, 2019 Filing 7 RESPONSE In Opposition to #6 MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by Robert B Saltzman. Replies due by 10/15/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "A")(Fulweiler, John)
October 3, 2019 MOTIONS REFERRED: #6 MOTION to Consolidate Cases referred for determination to Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (Barletta, Barbara)
October 3, 2019 Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond no longer assigned to the case. (Barletta, Barbara)
October 2, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by Simon Davison. Responses due by 10/16/2019. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Memorandum)(Aarsheim, Kirby)
September 27, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint by Simon Davison.(Aarsheim, Kirby)
September 13, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Robert B Saltzman. Simon Davison served on 9/13/2019, answer due 10/4/2019. (Fulweiler, John)
September 5, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Simon Davison. (Potter, Carrie)
September 5, 2019 Filing 2 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Potter, Carrie)
September 5, 2019 Case assigned to District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Potter, Carrie)
September 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1412481 ), filed by Robert B Saltzman. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Fulweiler, John)
September 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1412481 ), filed by Robert B Saltzman. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Fulweiler, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Saltzman v. Davison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Simon Davison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert B Saltzman
Represented By: John K. Fulweiler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?