Ponte Investments,LLC v. Blue Blood Brewing Company, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Ponte Investments,LLC
Defendant: Terri Carstenson, Colby Coash, Roger Stortenbecker, Brian C. Podwinski, Ralph Allen, Dale Dicke, Gretchen Wagner, Rodney Carstenson, Blue Blood Brewing Company, Inc., Tadd Delozier, Bruce Kucera, Adam Kosmicki, Brock Wagner, Mitch Montgomery, Michael McFarland and Ty Peteranetz
Case Number: 1:2019cv00464
Filed: September 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: Lincoln D Almond
Referring Judge: William E Smith
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 2, 2019 Filing 16 STIPULATION of Withdrawal of Appearance filed by Ponte Investments,LLC. (Mulhearn, Christopher)
October 25, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #13 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer; All Defendants answer due by 11/11/19. So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 10/25/2019. (Jackson, Ryan)
October 17, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE by Adam Kosmicki re #13 Joint MOTION for an Extension of Time to File Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint (Kohm, Katharine)
October 17, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE by Adam Kosmicki (Kohm, Katharine)
October 10, 2019 Filing 13 Joint MOTION for an Extension of Time to File Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Ralph Allen, Blue Blood Brewing Company, Inc., Rodney Carstenson, Terri Carstenson, Colby Coash, Tadd Delozier, Michael McFarland, Mitch Montgomery, Brian C. Podwinski, Roger Stortenbecker, Brock Wagner, Gretchen Wagner. Responses due by 10/24/2019. (Kohm, Katharine)
October 4, 2019 Filing 12 STIPULATION to Extend Time to Answer Complaint filed by Tadd Delozier, Michael McFarland. (Kohm, Katharine)
October 4, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE by Tadd Delozier, Michael McFarland (Kohm, Katharine)
October 1, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen M. Prignano on behalf of Ralph Allen, Blue Blood Brewing Company, Inc., Colby Coash, Roger Stortenbecker (Prignano, Stephen)
September 27, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entering #9 Stipulation Extending Time to Answer Complaint filed by Rodney Carstenson, Terri Carstenson, Mitch Montgomery, Brock Wagner, Gretchen Wagner. So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 9/27/2019. (Jackson, Ryan)
September 12, 2019 Filing 9 STIPULATION to Extend Time to Answer Complaint filed by Rodney Carstenson, Terri Carstenson, Mitch Montgomery, Brock Wagner, Gretchen Wagner. (Kohm, Katharine)
September 12, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE by Mitch Montgomery (Kohm, Katharine)
September 11, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Consent to Removal by Brian C. Podwinski (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(Potter, Carrie)
September 11, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE by Ralph Allen, Colby Coash, Roger Stortenbecker (Prignano, Stephen)
September 11, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE by Blue Blood Brewing Company, Inc. (Prignano, Stephen)
September 10, 2019 Filing 4 STATE COURT RECORD received electronically from the State of Rhode Island. (Simoncelli, Michael)
September 9, 2019 Filing 3 DECLARATION re #1 Notice of Removal - New Case, of Katharine E. Kohm regarding Defendant Brian C. Podwinski's Consent to Removal by Rodney Carstenson, Terri Carstenson, Brock Wagner, Gretchen Wagner. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Kohm, Katharine) (Main Document 3 replaced on 9/9/2019) (Simoncelli, Michael). (Attachment 1 replaced on 9/9/2019) (Simoncelli, Michael).
September 6, 2019 Filing 2 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Simoncelli, Michael)
September 6, 2019 Case assigned to Chief Judge William E. Smith and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Simoncelli, Michael)
September 5, 2019 Filing 1 NEW CASE/NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Kent County Superior Court, Case Number KC-2019-0882. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0103-1412892, filed by Terri Carstenson, Rodney Carstenson, Brock Wagner, Gretchen Wagner. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kohm, Katharine)
September 5, 2019 Filing 1 NEW CASE/NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Kent County Superior Court, Case Number KC-2019-0882. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0103-1412892, filed by Terri Carstenson, Rodney Carstenson, Brock Wagner, Gretchen Wagner. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kohm, Katharine)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ponte Investments,LLC v. Blue Blood Brewing Company, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terri Carstenson
Represented By: Katharine E. Kohm
Represented By: R. Thomas Dunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colby Coash
Represented By: Stephen M. Prignano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roger Stortenbecker
Represented By: Stephen M. Prignano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian C. Podwinski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ralph Allen
Represented By: Stephen M. Prignano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dale Dicke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gretchen Wagner
Represented By: Katharine E. Kohm
Represented By: R. Thomas Dunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rodney Carstenson
Represented By: Katharine E. Kohm
Represented By: R. Thomas Dunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blue Blood Brewing Company, Inc.
Represented By: Stephen M. Prignano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tadd Delozier
Represented By: Katharine E. Kohm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bruce Kucera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adam Kosmicki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brock Wagner
Represented By: Katharine E. Kohm
Represented By: R. Thomas Dunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mitch Montgomery
Represented By: Katharine E. Kohm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael McFarland
Represented By: Katharine E. Kohm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ty Peteranetz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ponte Investments,LLC
Represented By: Christopher M. Mulhearn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?