The Great Lakes Group, LLC et al v. Desai et al
Plaintiff: Motor City Pizza, LLC, Yum Yum Pizza, LLC, Gabbi Bazzi, The Great Lakes Group, LLC, Motor City Pizza II, LLC and G&H Enterprises, LLC
Defendant: Tejas V Desai, R.I.L.C. Holdings, LLC, Jai V Desai, Jai V. Desai and Tejas V. Desai
Case Number: 1:2019cv00465
Filed: September 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: Lincoln D Almond
Referring Judge: John J McConnell
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 23, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Hearing: Telephonic Rule 16 Conference set for Monday, 11/18/2019 at 08:45 AM before District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. The Court will initiate the call. Counsel shall provide the Clerk with contact information if it differs from the docket sheet. (Barletta, Barbara)
October 21, 2019 Filing 11 Defendants' ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses, COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by Jai V. Desai, Tejas V. Desai. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Lathia, Julie)
October 3, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Julie D. Lathia on behalf of All Defendants (Lathia, Julie)
October 1, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Julie D. Lathia. So Ordered by District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 10/1/2019. (Potter, Carrie)
October 1, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Dennis S. Baluch to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 100.00, receipt number 0103-1422048 ) filed by All Defendants. (Baluch, Dennis)
October 1, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Dennis S. Baluch on behalf of All Defendants (Baluch, Dennis)
September 18, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Gabbi Bazzi, The Great Lakes Group, LLC, Motor City Pizza, LLC, G&H Enterprises, LLC, Yum Yum Pizza, LLC, Motor City Pizza II, LLC. Tejas V. Desai served on 9/16/2019, answer due 10/7/2019. (Boughton, Shanna)
September 16, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Gabbi Bazzi, The Great Lakes Group, LLC, Motor City Pizza, LLC, G&H Enterprises, LLC, Yum Yum Pizza, LLC, Motor City Pizza II, LLC. Jai V. Desai served on 9/11/2019, answer due 10/2/2019. (Boughton, Shanna)
September 10, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Jai V. Desai, Tejas V. Desai. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(McGuire, Vickie)
September 10, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Request filed by Gabbi Bazzi, G&H Enterprises, LLC, Motor City Pizza II, LLC, Motor City Pizza, LLC, The Great Lakes Group, LLC, Yum Yum Pizza, LLC. (Boughton, Shanna)
September 10, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Request filed by Gabbi Bazzi, G&H Enterprises, LLC, Motor City Pizza II, LLC, Motor City Pizza, LLC, The Great Lakes Group, LLC, Yum Yum Pizza, LLC. (Boughton, Shanna)
September 6, 2019 Filing 2 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Simoncelli, Michael)
September 6, 2019 Case assigned to District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Simoncelli, Michael)
September 5, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1412905 ), filed by Gabbi Bazzi, The Great Lakes Group, LLC, Motor City Pizza, LLC, G&H Enterprises, LLC, Yum Yum Pizza, LLC, Motor City Pizza II, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Boughton, Shanna) (Main Document 1 replaced on 9/6/2019) (Simoncelli, Michael). (Attachment 6 replaced on 9/6/2019) (Simoncelli, Michael).
September 5, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1412905 ), filed by Gabbi Bazzi, The Great Lakes Group, LLC, Motor City Pizza, LLC, G&H Enterprises, LLC, Yum Yum Pizza, LLC, Motor City Pizza II, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Boughton, Shanna)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Great Lakes Group, LLC et al v. Desai et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Motor City Pizza, LLC
Represented By: Shanna M. Boughton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yum Yum Pizza, LLC
Represented By: Shanna M. Boughton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gabbi Bazzi
Represented By: Shanna M. Boughton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Great Lakes Group, LLC
Represented By: Shanna M. Boughton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Motor City Pizza II, LLC
Represented By: Shanna M. Boughton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: G&H Enterprises, LLC
Represented By: Shanna M. Boughton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tejas V Desai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R.I.L.C. Holdings, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jai V Desai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jai V. Desai
Represented By: Julie D. Lathia
Represented By: Dennis S. Baluch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tejas V. Desai
Represented By: Julie D. Lathia
Represented By: Dennis S. Baluch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?