Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation v. Lima et al
Plaintiff: Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation
Defendant: Paul L. Lima, New England Water Heater Co., Inc., State of Rhode Island, United States of America and Greenwood Credit Union
Case Number: 1:2019cv00474
Filed: September 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: William E Smith
Referring Judge: Patricia A Sullivan
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 5, 2019 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation. United States of America served on 10/28/2019, answer due 11/18/2019. (O'Shaughnessy, Eileen)
November 5, 2019 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation. State of Rhode Island served on 10/28/2019, answer due 11/18/2019. (O'Shaughnessy, Eileen)
November 5, 2019 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation. Greenwood Credit Union served on 10/28/2019, answer due 11/18/2019. (O'Shaughnessy, Eileen)
November 5, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation. Paul L. Lima served on 10/28/2019, answer due 11/18/2019. (O'Shaughnessy, Eileen)
October 22, 2019 Filing 11 Summons Issued as to State of Rhode Island, United States of America, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(Potter, Carrie)
October 22, 2019 Filing 10 Summons Request filed by Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation. (O'Shaughnessy, Eileen)
October 22, 2019 Filing 9 Summons Request filed by Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation. (O'Shaughnessy, Eileen)
October 22, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Request filed by Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation. (O'Shaughnessy, Eileen)
October 22, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Request filed by Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation. (O'Shaughnessy, Eileen)
September 12, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(McGuire, Vickie)
September 11, 2019 Filing 5 EXHIBIT IN SUPPORT by Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation in support of #1 Complaint Notice of Availability of Loss Mitigation and Mediation Programs. (O'Shaughnessy, Eileen)
September 11, 2019 Filing 4 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Potter, Carrie)
September 11, 2019 Case assigned to Chief Judge William E. Smith and Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (Potter, Carrie)
September 11, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation. (O'Shaughnessy, Eileen)
September 11, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Request filed by Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Greenwood, #2 New England Water, #3 State of Rhode Island, #4 IRS)(O'Shaughnessy, Eileen)
September 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1414768 ), filed by Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-9 multiple combined exhibits, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(O'Shaughnessy, Eileen)
September 11, 2019 Filing 5 EXHIBIT IN SUPPORT by Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation in support of #1 Complaint Notice of Availability of Loss Mitigation and Mediation Programs. (O'Shaughnessy, Eileen)
September 11, 2019 Filing 4 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Potter, Carrie)
September 11, 2019 Case assigned to Chief Judge William E. Smith and Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (Potter, Carrie)
September 11, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation. (O'Shaughnessy, Eileen)
September 11, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Request filed by Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Greenwood, #2 New England Water, #3 State of Rhode Island, #4 IRS)(O'Shaughnessy, Eileen)
September 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1414768 ), filed by Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-9 multiple combined exhibits, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(O'Shaughnessy, Eileen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation v. Lima et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul L. Lima
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New England Water Heater Co., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Rhode Island
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greenwood Credit Union
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation
Represented By: Eileen C. O'Shaughnessy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?