Acciardo v. Roberts et al
Plaintiff: Gregory J Acciardo
Defendant: John Roberts and Patricia Roberts
Case Number: 1:2019cv00477
Filed: September 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: John J McConnell
Referring Judge: Patricia A Sullivan
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 6, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entering #9 Stipulation of Dismissal with prejudice - So Ordered by District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 11/6/2019. (Barletta, Barbara)
November 5, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE by John Roberts, Patricia Roberts of Dismissal (Bengtson, C.)
November 1, 2019 HEARING CANCELLED: The telephonic rule 16 conference scheduled for Monday, 11/4/19 at 9:00 a.m. before Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. is cancelled (Barletta, Barbara)
October 2, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Hearing: Telephonic Rule 16 Conference set for Monday, 11/4/2019 at 09:00 AM before District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. The Court will initiate the call. Counsel shall provide the Clerk with contact information if it differs from the docket sheet. (Barletta, Barbara)
September 30, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint by John Roberts, Patricia Roberts.(Bengtson, C.)
September 30, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by C. Russell Bengtson on behalf of John Roberts, Patricia Roberts (Bengtson, C.)
September 23, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Gregory J Acciardo. Patricia Roberts served on 9/16/2019, answer due 10/7/2019. (Acciardo, Gregory)
September 23, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Gregory J Acciardo. John Roberts served on 9/16/2019, answer due 10/7/2019. (Acciardo, Gregory)
September 12, 2019 Filing 3 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Farrell Pletcher, Paula)
September 12, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to John Roberts, Patricia Roberts. (Farrell Pletcher, Paula)
September 12, 2019 Case assigned to District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (Farrell Pletcher, Paula)
September 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1415205 ), filed by Gregory J Acciardo. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Acciardo, Gregory)
September 12, 2019 Filing 3 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Farrell Pletcher, Paula)
September 12, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to John Roberts, Patricia Roberts. (Farrell Pletcher, Paula)
September 12, 2019 Case assigned to District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (Farrell Pletcher, Paula)
September 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1415205 ), filed by Gregory J Acciardo. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Acciardo, Gregory)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Acciardo v. Roberts et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patricia Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory J Acciardo
Represented By: Gregory J. Acciardo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?