Baglini et al v. United Services Automobile Association Casualty Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Susan Baglini and Joseph Baglini
Defendant: United Services Automobile Assocition Casualty Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2019cv00482
Filed: September 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: John J McConnell
Referring Judge: Patricia A Sullivan
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 8, 2019 Filing 8 RULE 16 STATEMENT by All Plaintiffs. (Boisclair, Yvette)
November 4, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Hearing: Rule 16 Conference set for 11/18/2019 at 10:30 AM in Judge McElroy's Chambers before District Judge Mary S. McElroy. (Urizandi, Nisshy)
November 1, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Hearing: Rule 16 Conference set for 11/18/2019 at 11:00 AM in Judge McElroy's Chambers before District Judge Mary S. McElroy. (Urizandi, Nisshy)
October 21, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to #4 Amended Complaint by United Services Automobile Assocition Casualty Insurance Company.(Cain, Kevin)
October 8, 2019 Case reassigned to District Judge Mary S. McElroy. District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. no longer assigned to the case. (Barletta, Barbara)
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER: This case is transferred to the calendar of Judge Mary S. McElroy - So Ordered by District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 10/8/2019. (Barletta, Barbara)
October 8, 2019 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Susan Baglini, Joseph Baglini.(Boisclair, Yvette)
September 17, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to United Services Automobile Assocition Casualty Insurance Company. (Potter, Carrie)
September 17, 2019 Filing 2 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Potter, Carrie)
September 17, 2019 Case assigned to District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (Potter, Carrie)
September 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1416298 ), filed by Susan Baglini, Joseph Baglini. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit USAA Insurance contract, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 summons)(Boisclair, Yvette)
September 17, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to United Services Automobile Assocition Casualty Insurance Company. (Potter, Carrie)
September 17, 2019 Filing 2 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Potter, Carrie)
September 17, 2019 Case assigned to District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (Potter, Carrie)
September 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1416298 ), filed by Susan Baglini, Joseph Baglini. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit USAA Insurance contract, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 summons)(Boisclair, Yvette)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Baglini et al v. United Services Automobile Association Casualty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Baglini
Represented By: Mark S. Mandell
Represented By: Yvette M. Boisclair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Baglini
Represented By: Mark S. Mandell
Represented By: Yvette M. Boisclair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Services Automobile Assocition Casualty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?