Thompson v. City of Pawtucket et al
Plaintiff: John-Lamont Thompson
Defendant: City of Pawtucket and Ronald Travers
Case Number: 1:2019cv00483
Filed: September 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: John J McConnell
Referring Judge: Mary S McElroy
2 Judge: Patricia A Sullivan
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1333
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 7, 2019 Filing 8 Process Return and Receipt Executed by United States Marshal, SUMMONS Returned Executed City of Pawtucket served on 10/28/2019, answer due 11/18/2019; Ronald Travers served on 10/28/2019, answer due 11/18/2019. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Potter, Carrie)
November 7, 2019 Filing 7 USMS Indigent Filer Reimbursement Request. (Potter, Carrie)
November 5, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by City of Pawtucket, Ronald Travers. Responses due by 11/19/2019. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Memorandum)(DeSisto, Michael)
October 8, 2019 Case reassigned to District Judge Mary S. McElroy. District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. no longer assigned to the case. (Barletta, Barbara)
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER: This case is transferred to the calendar of Judge Mary S. McElroy - So Ordered by District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 10/8/2019. (Barletta, Barbara)
October 1, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to City of Pawtucket, Ronald Travers; Process Receipt & Return to Marshall service. (McGuire, Vickie)
September 19, 2019 Filing 4 Letter sent to John Lamont-Thompson requesting that the Process Receipt and Return form (USM-285) and summons be completed in order for the U.S. Marshals Service to effectuate service pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(c)(3). USM -285 form can be found by clicking # here. (Urizandi, Nisshy)
September 19, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis - So Ordered by District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 9/19/2019. (Urizandi, Nisshy)
September 18, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by John-Lamont Thompson. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Farrell Pletcher, Paula)
September 18, 2019 Filing 2 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Farrell Pletcher, Paula)
September 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by John-Lamont Thompson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Farrell Pletcher, Paula)
September 18, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by John-Lamont Thompson. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Farrell Pletcher, Paula)
September 18, 2019 Filing 2 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Farrell Pletcher, Paula)
September 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by John-Lamont Thompson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Farrell Pletcher, Paula)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thompson v. City of Pawtucket et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Pawtucket
Represented By: Michael A. DeSisto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald Travers
Represented By: Michael A. DeSisto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John-Lamont Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?