Souza et al v. Gulliver's Tavern Inc. d/b/a Foxy Lady Too d/b/a Foxy Lady et al
Plaintiff: Alana Souza, Laurie Young, Ursula Sanchez, Alana Campos, Ursula Mayes, Amber Lancaster, Vida Guerra, Laurie Romeo, Paola Canas, Jaime Edmondson-Longoria, Lucy Pinder and Eva Pepaj
Defendant: Patricia Tsoumas and Gulliver's Tavern Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00492
Filed: September 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: John J McConnell
Referring Judge: Patricia A Sullivan
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1125
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 11, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 18, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #10 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Luke Lirot - So Ordered by District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 11/18/2019. (Barletta, Barbara)
November 15, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint by Gulliver's Tavern Inc., Patricia Tsoumas.(Doherty, Sean)
November 15, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Luke Lirot to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 100.00, receipt number 0103-1446704 ) filed by All Defendants. (Doherty, Sean)
November 15, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Sean R. Doherty on behalf of All Defendants (Doherty, Sean)
October 30, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lucy Pinder, Vida Guerra, Paola Canas, Amber Lancaster, Laurie Young, Ursula Sanchez, Eva Pepaj, Alana Souza, Jaime Edmondson-Longoria. Gulliver's Tavern Inc. served on 10/25/2019, answer due 11/15/2019. (Whitehead, Glen)
October 8, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Gulliver's Tavern Inc., Patricia Tsoumas. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(McGuire, Vickie)
October 8, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Request filed by Paola Canas, Jaime Edmondson-Longoria, Vida Guerra, Amber Lancaster, Eva Pepaj, Lucy Pinder, Ursula Sanchez, Alana Souza, Laurie Young. (Whitehead, Glen)
October 8, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Request filed by Paola Canas, Jaime Edmondson-Longoria, Vida Guerra, Amber Lancaster, Eva Pepaj, Lucy Pinder, Ursula Sanchez, Alana Souza, Laurie Young. (Whitehead, Glen)
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of John V. Golaszewski - So Ordered by District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 9/30/2019. (Barletta, Barbara)
September 24, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for John V. Golaszewski to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 100.00, receipt number 0103-1418940 ) filed by All Plaintiffs. (Whitehead, Glen)
September 23, 2019 CASE PERMANENTLY ASSIGNED: Since District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. has determined that this case is in fact related to CA 19-491-JJM, this case is permanently assigned to District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. for all further proceedings (Barletta, Barbara)
September 20, 2019 Filing 3 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Farrell Pletcher, Paula)
September 20, 2019 Filing 3 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Farrell Pletcher, Paula)
September 20, 2019 Filing 2 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Potter, Carrie)
September 20, 2019 Filing 2 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Potter, Carrie)
September 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1417742 ), filed by Lucy Pinder, Vida Guerra, Paola Canas, Amber Lancaster, Laurie Young, Ursula Sanchez, Eva Pepaj, Alana Souza, Jaime Edmondson-Longoria. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-I, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Whitehead, Glen)
September 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1417742 ), filed by Lucy Pinder, Vida Guerra, Paola Canas, Amber Lancaster, Laurie Young, Ursula Sanchez, Eva Pepaj, Alana Souza, Jaime Edmondson-Longoria. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-I, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Whitehead, Glen)
September 20, 2019 CASE CONDITIONALLY ASSIGNED to District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. Related Case Number 19-cv-491-JJM-PAS based upon the indication on the cover sheet that a related case previously was assigned to the presiding judge. The assignment is subject to the presiding judge's determination that the cases, in fact, are related. (Potter, Carrie)
September 20, 2019 CASE CONDITIONALLY ASSIGNED to District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. Related Case Number 19-cv-491-JJM-PAS based upon the indication on the cover sheet that a related case previously was assigned to the presiding judge. The assignment is subject to the presiding judge's determination that the cases, in fact, are related. (Potter, Carrie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Souza et al v. Gulliver's Tavern Inc. d/b/a Foxy Lady Too d/b/a Foxy Lady et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alana Souza
Represented By: Glen R. Whitehead
Represented By: John V. Golaszewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laurie Young
Represented By: Glen R. Whitehead
Represented By: John V. Golaszewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ursula Sanchez
Represented By: Glen R. Whitehead
Represented By: John V. Golaszewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alana Campos
Represented By: Glen R. Whitehead
Represented By: John V. Golaszewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ursula Mayes
Represented By: Glen R. Whitehead
Represented By: John V. Golaszewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amber Lancaster
Represented By: Glen R. Whitehead
Represented By: John V. Golaszewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vida Guerra
Represented By: Glen R. Whitehead
Represented By: John V. Golaszewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laurie Romeo
Represented By: Glen R. Whitehead
Represented By: John V. Golaszewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paola Canas
Represented By: Glen R. Whitehead
Represented By: John V. Golaszewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jaime Edmondson-Longoria
Represented By: Glen R. Whitehead
Represented By: John V. Golaszewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lucy Pinder
Represented By: Glen R. Whitehead
Represented By: John V. Golaszewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eva Pepaj
Represented By: Glen R. Whitehead
Represented By: John V. Golaszewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patricia Tsoumas
Represented By: Sean R. Doherty
Represented By: Luke Lirot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gulliver's Tavern Inc.
Represented By: Sean R. Doherty
Represented By: Luke Lirot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?