Lucia v. The South Kingstown School Department et al
Plaintiff: Jacqueline S. Lucia
Defendant: The South Kingstown School Department, Patricia Sutherland, The Town of South Kingstown and Kristen E. Stringfellow
Case Number: 1:2019cv00507
Filed: September 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29:2601
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 19, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entering #8 Stipulation of Dismissal as to Defendant Stringfellow filed by Jacqueline S. Lucia. So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 11/19/2019. (Jackson, Ryan)
November 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STANDARD PRETRIAL ORDER: Factual Discovery to close by 5/15/2020; Plaintiff Expert Disclosures shall be made by 3/31/2020; Defendant Expert Disclosures shall be made by 4/30/2020; Expert Discovery to close by 5/15/2020; Dispositive Motions due by 5/31/2020; Pretrial Memorandum due by 6/15/2020 or 30 days after a decision on any dispositive motion. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond on 11/18/2019. (Noel, Jeannine)
November 18, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond: TELEPHONIC Rule 16 Conference held on 11/18/2019 (Enright, Hilton) (Court Reporter FTR in Courtroom A at 2:01 pm.) (Noel, Jeannine)
November 18, 2019 Filing 8 STIPULATION of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Jacqueline S. Lucia. (Enright, Thomas)
November 4, 2019 RESCHEDULING NOTICE of Hearing: Telephonic Rule 16 Conference RESCHEDULED for 11/18/2019 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom A before Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. The Court will initiate the call. Counsel shall provide the Clerk with contact information if it differs from the docket sheet. MOVED FROM 11/15/2019. (Noel, Jeannine)
November 4, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Hearing: Telephonic Rule 16 Conference set for 11/15/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom A before Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. The Court will initiate the call. Counsel shall provide the Clerk with contact information if it differs from the docket sheet. (Noel, Jeannine)
November 1, 2019 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond to conduct a Rule 16 Conference. (Jackson, Ryan)
October 4, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER: Pursuant to Rule 26 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the parties are directed to begin their mandatory disclosures immediately, before the Rule 16 conference. To the extent that the parties wish to begin discovery on a cooperative basis prior to the initial conference, they are encouraged to do so. So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 10/4/2019. (Jackson, Ryan)
September 26, 2019 Filing 6 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Potter, Carrie)
September 26, 2019 Case assigned to Chief Judge William E. Smith and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Potter, Carrie)
September 25, 2019 Filing 5 STATE COURT RECORD received electronically from the State of Rhode Island. (Farrell Pletcher, Paula)
September 25, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint by Kristen E. Stringfellow, Patricia Sutherland, The South Kingstown School Department, The Town of South Kingstown.(Hilton, Kathleen)
September 25, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Marc DeSisto on behalf of All Defendants (DeSisto, Marc)
September 25, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Kathleen A. Hilton on behalf of All Defendants (Hilton, Kathleen)
September 25, 2019 Filing 1 NEW CASE/NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Washington County Superior Court, Case Number WC-2017-0129. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0103-1419375, filed by Kristen E. Stringfellow, Patricia Sutherland, The Town of South Kingstown, The South Kingstown School Department. (Attachments: #1 State Court Complaint, #2 Notice of Removal - State Court, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hilton, Kathleen)
September 25, 2019 Filing 5 STATE COURT RECORD received electronically from the State of Rhode Island. (Farrell Pletcher, Paula)
September 25, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint by Kristen E. Stringfellow, Patricia Sutherland, The South Kingstown School Department, The Town of South Kingstown.(Hilton, Kathleen)
September 25, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Marc DeSisto on behalf of All Defendants (DeSisto, Marc)
September 25, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Kathleen A. Hilton on behalf of All Defendants (Hilton, Kathleen)
September 25, 2019 Filing 1 NEW CASE/NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Washington County Superior Court, Case Number WC-2017-0129. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0103-1419375, filed by Kristen E. Stringfellow, Patricia Sutherland, The Town of South Kingstown, The South Kingstown School Department. (Attachments: #1 State Court Complaint, #2 Notice of Removal - State Court, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hilton, Kathleen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lucia v. The South Kingstown School Department et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The South Kingstown School Department
Represented By: Marc DeSisto
Represented By: Kathleen A. Hilton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patricia Sutherland
Represented By: Marc DeSisto
Represented By: Kathleen A. Hilton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Town of South Kingstown
Represented By: Marc DeSisto
Represented By: Kathleen A. Hilton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kristen E. Stringfellow
Represented By: Marc DeSisto
Represented By: Kathleen A. Hilton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacqueline S. Lucia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?