Colon v. Bayview Loan Servicing, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Julio Colon
Defendant: Bayview Loan Servicing, LLC, Federal Housing Finance Agency and Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation
Case Number: 1:2019cv00517
Filed: September 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: William E Smith
Referring Judge: Patricia A Sullivan
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 14, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Bayview Loan Servicing, LLC. Responses due by 11/29/2019. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Memorandum)(Magher, Amy)
November 14, 2019 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Bayview Loan Servicing, LLC. (Magher, Amy)
November 14, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Amy Magher on behalf of Bayview Loan Servicing, LLC (Magher, Amy)
November 6, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation, Federal Housing Finance Agency. Responses due by 11/20/2019. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Memorandum, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(Bodurtha, Samuel)
October 25, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint up to and including 11/6/19. So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 10/25/2019. (Jackson, Ryan)
October 15, 2019 Filing 5 STATE COURT RECORD received electronically from the State of Rhode Island. (Simoncelli, Michael)
October 3, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for an Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation, Federal Housing Finance Agency. Responses due by 10/17/2019. (Bodurtha, Samuel)
September 30, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation. (Bodurtha, Samuel)
September 30, 2019 Filing 2 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Farrell Pletcher, Paula)
September 30, 2019 Case assigned to Chief Judge William E. Smith and Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (Farrell Pletcher, Paula)
September 30, 2019 Filing 1 NEW CASE/NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Providence County Superior Court, Case Number PC-2019-4384. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0103-1421386, filed by Federal Housing Finance Agency, Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #3 Exhibit B - Summons and Complaint, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Bodurtha, Samuel)
September 30, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation. (Bodurtha, Samuel)
September 30, 2019 Filing 2 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Farrell Pletcher, Paula)
September 30, 2019 Case assigned to Chief Judge William E. Smith and Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (Farrell Pletcher, Paula)
September 30, 2019 Filing 1 NEW CASE/NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Providence County Superior Court, Case Number PC-2019-4384. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0103-1421386, filed by Federal Housing Finance Agency, Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #3 Exhibit B - Summons and Complaint, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Bodurtha, Samuel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Colon v. Bayview Loan Servicing, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bayview Loan Servicing, LLC
Represented By: Amy Magher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Housing Finance Agency
Represented By: Samuel C. Bodurtha
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation
Represented By: Samuel C. Bodurtha
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julio Colon
Represented By: Corey J. Allard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?