Anvar et al v. Tanner et al
Plaintiff: Kambis Anvar, Vincent Colapietro, Michelle Drum and Michael Osean
Defendant: Peter Neronha and Elizabeth Tanner
Case Number: 1:2019cv00523
Filed: October 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: Lincoln D Almond
Referring Judge: John J McConnell
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 29, 2019 Filing 13 Assented MOTION for an Extension of Time filed by Peter Neronha, Elizabeth Tanner. Responses due by 12/13/2019. (Hill, Lauren)
November 4, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #10 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of James A. Tanford, Robert D. Epstein, Joseph Beutel ; granting #11 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of James A. Tanford, Robert D. Epstein, Joseph Beutel ; granting #12 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of James A. Tanford, Robert D. Epstein, Joseph Beutel. So Ordered by District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 11/4/2019. (Farrell Pletcher, Paula)
November 1, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for James A. Tanford to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 100.00, receipt number 0103-1438421 ) filed by All Plaintiffs. (Summer, Scott)
November 1, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Joseph Beutel to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 100.00, receipt number 0103-1438420 ) filed by All Plaintiffs. (Summer, Scott)
November 1, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Robert D. Epstein to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 100.00, receipt number 0103-1438419 ) filed by All Plaintiffs. (Summer, Scott)
October 29, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer; Reset Deadlines: Peter Neronha answer due 12/2/2019; Elizabeth Tanner answer due 12/2/2019 - So Ordered by District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 10/29/2019 (Barletta, Barbara)
October 28, 2019 Filing 9 Assented MOTION for an Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Peter Neronha, Elizabeth Tanner. Responses due by 11/12/2019. (Shea, Andrea)
October 28, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Lauren E. Hill on behalf of Peter Neronha, Elizabeth Tanner (Hill, Lauren)
October 28, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrea M. Shea on behalf of Peter Neronha, Elizabeth Tanner (Shea, Andrea)
October 22, 2019 CORRECTIVE DOCKET ENTRY Regarding: #4 Affidavit of Service. Please disregard, filed with incorrect date of service. See #6 for correct Affidavit of Service. (Smith, Rana)
October 20, 2019 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service, filed by Michael Osean, Kambis Anvar, Michelle Drum, Vincent Colapietro for Summons Constable Courtney A. Clark Peter Neronha served on 10/10/2019, answer due 10/31/2019. (Summer, Scott)
October 20, 2019 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service, filed by Michael Osean, Kambis Anvar, Michelle Drum, Vincent Colapietro for Summons Constable Courtney A. Clark Elizabeth Tanner served on 10/10/2019, answer due 10/31/2019. (Summer, Scott)
October 20, 2019 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service, filed by Michael Osean, Kambis Anvar, Michelle Drum, Vincent Colapietro for Summons Constable Courtney A. Clark Peter Neronha served on 10/8/2019, answer due 10/29/2019. (Summer, Scott)
October 4, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Potter, Carrie)
October 4, 2019 Filing 2 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Potter, Carrie)
October 4, 2019 Case assigned to District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Potter, Carrie)
October 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1423137 ), filed by Michael Osean, Kambis Anvar, Michelle Drum, Vincent Colapietro. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons RIDBR, #3 Summons RIAG)(Summer, Scott)
October 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1423137 ), filed by Michael Osean, Kambis Anvar, Michelle Drum, Vincent Colapietro. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons RIDBR, #3 Summons RIAG)(Summer, Scott)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Anvar et al v. Tanner et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kambis Anvar
Represented By: Scott J. Summer
Represented By: Joseph Beutel
Represented By: James A. Tanford
Represented By: Robert D. Epstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vincent Colapietro
Represented By: Scott J. Summer
Represented By: Joseph Beutel
Represented By: James A. Tanford
Represented By: Robert D. Epstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle Drum
Represented By: Scott J. Summer
Represented By: Joseph Beutel
Represented By: James A. Tanford
Represented By: Robert D. Epstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Osean
Represented By: Scott J. Summer
Represented By: Joseph Beutel
Represented By: James A. Tanford
Represented By: Robert D. Epstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter Neronha
Represented By: Andrea M. Shea
Represented By: Lauren E. Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elizabeth Tanner
Represented By: Andrea M. Shea
Represented By: Lauren E. Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?