Bursztyn v. Bursztyn
Plaintiff: Moshe Bursztyn
Defendant: Kayla Bursztyn
Case Number: 1:2019cv00525
Filed: October 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: Lincoln D Almond
Referring Judge: William E Smith
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 7, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER Entering #9 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Moshe Bursztyn. So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 11/7/2019. (Jackson, Ryan)
November 6, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Moshe Bursztyn (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(Potter, Carrie)
October 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION FOR SUMMARY DISMISSAL PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. 1915(e) and Order - Plaintiff's Motions to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (Doc. Nos. 2 and 5) are GRANTED. However, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2)(B), I further recommend that Plaintiff's Complaints (ECF Nos. 1, 4 and 7) and this case be DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. re #7 Amended Complaint filed by Moshe Bursztyn, #5 Second MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Moshe Bursztyn, #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Moshe Bursztyn, #1 Complaint filed by Moshe Bursztyn, #4 Amended Complaint filed by Moshe Bursztyn ( Objections to R&R due by 11/7/2019.) So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond on 10/24/2019. (Noel, Jeannine)
October 23, 2019 Filing 7 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against Kayla Bursztyn filed by Moshe Bursztyn. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Envelope)(Potter, Carrie)
October 23, 2019 Filing 6 Pro Se Consent to Receive Documents Electronically filed by Moshe Bursztyn. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(Potter, Carrie)
October 22, 2019 MOTIONS REFERRED: #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis , #5 Second MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis referred for determination to Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Jackson, Ryan)
October 10, 2019 Filing 5 Second MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Moshe Bursztyn. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Potter, Carrie)
October 10, 2019 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Kayla Bursztyn, filed by Moshe Bursztyn. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Summons, #7 Envelope)(Potter, Carrie)
October 7, 2019 Notice of Availability to Receive Documents Electronically. Pro Se litigants are encouraged to review the details of the Consent & Registration Form and if interested, complete the Registration Form and return it to the Clerks Office. Click # here to access the form. (Potter, Carrie)
October 7, 2019 Filing 3 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Potter, Carrie)
October 7, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Moshe Bursztyn. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Potter, Carrie)
October 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, filed by Moshe Bursztyn. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Summons, #7 Envelope)(Potter, Carrie)
October 7, 2019 Notice of Availability to Receive Documents Electronically. Pro Se litigants are encouraged to review the details of the Consent & Registration Form and if interested, complete the Registration Form and return it to the Clerks Office. Click # here to access the form. (Potter, Carrie)
October 7, 2019 Filing 3 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Potter, Carrie)
October 7, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Moshe Bursztyn. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Potter, Carrie)
October 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, filed by Moshe Bursztyn. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Summons, #7 Envelope)(Potter, Carrie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bursztyn v. Bursztyn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kayla Bursztyn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Moshe Bursztyn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?