Bean v. Johnson & Wales University
Plaintiff: Loretta Bean
Defendant: Johnson & Wales University
Case Number: 1:2019cv00528
Filed: October 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Office: Providence Office
Presiding Judge: Lincoln D Almond
Referring Judge: William E Smith
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 4, 2019 Filing 27 NOTICE of Hearing: Telephonic Rule 16 Conference set for 12/16/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom A before Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. The Court will initiate the call. Counsel shall provide the Clerk with contact information if it differs from the docket sheet. (Noel, Jeannine)
December 2, 2019 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond to conduct a Rule 16 Conference. (Jackson, Ryan)
December 2, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER: Pursuant to Rule 26 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the parties are directed to begin their mandatory disclosures immediately, before the Rule 16 conference. To the extent that the parties wish to begin discovery on a cooperative basis prior to the initial conference, they are encouraged to do so. So Ordered by District Judge William E. Smith on 12/2/2019. (Jackson, Ryan)
November 24, 2019 Filing 26 ANSWER to #25 Amended Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by Johnson & Wales University.(Richard, Steven)
November 19, 2019 Filing 25 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Johnson & Wales University filed by Loretta Bean.(Jackson, Ryan)
November 19, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER denying without prejudice #21 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings; and granting #23 Motion to Amend Complaint: The Court GRANTS #23 Plaintiff's Motion to Amend Complaint, which Defendant has #24 assented to, and Defendant has 14 days from the date of this order to respond to the Amended Complaint. Therefore, Plaintiff's #21 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings is denied WITHOUT prejudice to re-file. So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 11/19/2019. (Jackson, Ryan)
November 11, 2019 Filing 24 RESPONSE In Opposition to #23 First MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint (Assenting to Plaintiff's Filing of Amended Complaint) filed by Johnson & Wales University. Replies due by 11/18/2019. (Richard, Steven)
November 3, 2019 Filing 23 First MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint filed by Loretta Bean. Responses due by 11/18/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Amended Complaint)(Welsh, Richard)
November 3, 2019 Filing 22 RESPONSE In Opposition to #21 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Loretta Bean. Replies due by 11/12/2019. (Welsh, Richard)
October 22, 2019 Filing 21 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Johnson & Wales University. Responses due by 11/5/2019. (Richard, Steven)
October 22, 2019 Filing 20 ANSWER to Complaint by Johnson & Wales University.(Richard, Steven)
October 15, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard M. Welsh, Jr. on behalf of Loretta Bean (Welsh, Richard)
October 9, 2019 Filing 18 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Farrell Pletcher, Paula)
October 9, 2019 Filing 17 Case transferred in from District of Massachusetts; Case Number 1:19-cv-11197. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Pursuant to LR Gen 201(b)(5), counsel who is a member in good standing of the bar of another federal district court is exempt from the requirements of bar membership, and may appear and practice in this Court for this case. Counsel is directed to register as an ECF Filing User in accordance with LR Gen 304(a) by completing the ECF Registration Form located under the CM/ECF Quick Link from our website. #http://www.rid.uscourts.gov
October 9, 2019 Filing 16 Case transferred to the District of Rhode Island;. Case Electronically Transferred to Clerk in that district. (Vieira, Leonardo)
October 9, 2019 Filing 18 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Farrell Pletcher, Paula)
October 9, 2019 Filing 17 Case transferred in from District of Massachusetts; Case Number 1:19-cv-11197. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Pursuant to LR Gen 201(b)(5), counsel who is a member in good standing of the bar of another federal district court is exempt from the requirements of bar membership, and may appear and practice in this Court for this case. Counsel is directed to register as an ECF Filing User in accordance with LR Gen 304(a) by completing the ECF Registration Form located under the CM/ECF Quick Link from our website. #http://www.rid.uscourts.gov
October 9, 2019 Filing 16 Case transferred to the District of Rhode Island;. Case Electronically Transferred to Clerk in that district. (Vieira, Leonardo)
October 8, 2019 Filing 15 Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ORDER entered. MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: In accordance with the foregoing, defendant's motion to dismiss for lack of personal jurisdiction in this Court (Docket No. #9 ) is ALLOWED but plaintiff's action is hereby TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court of the District of Rhode Island for further proceedings pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1631.So ordered. (Vieira, Leonardo)
June 26, 2019 Filing 14 REPLY to Response to #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Johnson & Wales University. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Janice Taylor)(Walker, Kacey)
June 26, 2019 Filing 13 Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered ALLOWING #12 Motion for Leave to File Document ; Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. (Vieira, Leonardo)
June 25, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Leave to File Reply in Further Support of Motion to Dismiss by Johnson & Wales University. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Memorandum of Law in Further Support of Motion to Dismiss, #2 Declaration of Janice Taylor)(Walker, Kacey)
June 17, 2019 Filing 11 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Loretta Bean. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Loretta Bean)(Welsh, Richard)
June 7, 2019 Filing 10 STATE COURT Record. (Vieira, Leonardo)
June 4, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Johnson & Wales University. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #2 Declaration of Emily Gilcreast)(Walker, Kacey)
June 3, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard M. Welsh, Jr on behalf of Loretta Bean (Welsh, Richard)
May 29, 2019 Filing 7 Certified Copy of Notice of Removal Provided to Defense Counsel by Email. (Jones, Sherry)
May 29, 2019 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley. (Finn, Mary)
May 28, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven M. Richard on behalf of Johnson & Wales University (Richard, Steven)
May 28, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Kacey Houston Walker on behalf of Johnson & Wales University (Walker, Kacey)
May 28, 2019 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Johnson & Wales University. (Walker, Kacey)
May 28, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Johnson & Wales University ( Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7705350 Fee Status: Filing Fee paid) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Walker, Kacey)
May 28, 2019 Filing 1 Civil Cover Sheet & Category Sheet by Johnson & Wales University. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Walker, Kacey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bean v. Johnson & Wales University
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Loretta Bean
Represented By: Christopher W. Kita
Represented By: Richard M. Welsh, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Wales University
Represented By: Steven M. Richard
Represented By: Kacey Houston Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?