Jabir Bey v. Esposito et al
Plaintiff: Leonitus Jabir Bey
Defendant: Chris, Prete, Chotman, Q, Diaz, Eli, Scachelo, Rosso, Williams and Lt. Esposito
Case Number: 1:2019cv00535
Filed: October 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: Lincoln D Almond
Referring Judge: Mary S McElroy
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 18:241
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 15, 2019 Filing 6 JUDGMENT dismissing this civil action - entered by the Clerk of Court on 11/15/2019. (Urizandi, Nisshy)
November 15, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER: By order entered 10/22/2019, the plaintiff was directed to re-file his application to proceed without prepayment of fees and affidavit or, in the alternative, pay the filing fee on or before 11/5/2019, and was warned that failure to do so would lead to dismissal of this action for lack of diligent prosecution. Plaintiff's offer in his 11/4/2019 response of one (1) Troy ounce.999 fine silver-coin is not an acceptable form of payment. Plaintiff having failed to comply with this Court's 10/22/2019 order, it is hereby ordered that the above-captioned case be dismissed for lack of diligent prosecution. The Clerk is hereby directed to enter judgment pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 58 - So Ordered by District Judge Mary S. McElroy on 11/15/2019. (Urizandi, Nisshy)
November 4, 2019 Filing 5 RESPONSE by Leonitus Jabir Bey re Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (Hicks, Alyson)
October 29, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Change of Address by Leonitus Jabir Bey (Potter, Carrie)
October 22, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER denying without prejudice #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Plaintiff shall re-file his motion with the requested financial information or pay the initial filing fee of $400.00 on or before 11/5/2019. Failure to do so may result in the dismissal of this action without prejudice - So Ordered by District Judge Mary S. McElroy on 10/22/2019. (Urizandi, Nisshy)
October 11, 2019 Notice of Availability to Receive Documents Electronically. Pro Se litigants are encouraged to review the details of the Consent & Registration Form and if interested, complete the Registration Form and return it to the Clerks Office. Click # here to access the form. (Potter, Carrie)
October 10, 2019 Filing 3 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Simoncelli, Michael)
October 10, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Leonitus Jabir Bey. (Simoncelli, Michael)
October 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, filed by Leonitus Jabir Bey. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Simoncelli, Michael)
October 10, 2019 CASE CONDITIONALLY ASSIGNED based upon the indication that a related case previously was assigned to the presiding judge. The assignment is subject to the presiding judge's determination that the cases, in fact, are related. Related Case Number 19-cv-526-MSM-LDA. (Simoncelli, Michael)
October 10, 2019 Filing 3 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Simoncelli, Michael)
October 10, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Leonitus Jabir Bey. (Simoncelli, Michael)
October 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, filed by Leonitus Jabir Bey. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Simoncelli, Michael)
October 10, 2019 CASE CONDITIONALLY ASSIGNED based upon the indication that a related case previously was assigned to the presiding judge. The assignment is subject to the presiding judge's determination that the cases, in fact, are related. Related Case Number 19-cv-526-MSM-LDA. (Simoncelli, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jabir Bey v. Esposito et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prete
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chotman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Q
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scachelo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rosso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lt. Esposito
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leonitus Jabir Bey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?