Silvia v. Woonsocket Housing Authority et al
Plaintiff: David A. Silvia
Defendant: Robert Moreau, Woonsocket Housing Authority and David M. aRusso
Case Number: 1:2019cv00544
Filed: October 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: Lincoln D Almond
Referring Judge: John J McConnell
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 5, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to David M. aRusso; Amended Complaint, Summons, USM285 sent to USM to for service. (McGuire, Vickie) (Main Document 8 replaced on 11/5/2019) (McGuire, Vickie).
November 5, 2019 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Woonsocket Housing Authority, David M. aRusso filed by David A. Silvia.(Barletta, Barbara)
October 28, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Woonsocket Housing Authority. Summons, USMS 285 and Orders Granting Motions to Proceed In Forma Pauperis forwarded to U.S. Marshal Service. (Farrell Pletcher, Paula)
October 23, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #5 Motion to Amend/Correct. Plaintiff may amend his complaint as a matter of right 21 days after serving it -- So Ordered by District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 10/23/2019. (Barletta, Barbara)
October 21, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint filed by David A. Silvia. Responses due by 11/4/2019. (McGuire, Vickie)
October 21, 2019 CASE PERMANENTLY ASSIGNED: Since District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. has determined that this case is in fact related to CA 19-142 this case is permanently assigned to District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. for all further proceedings (Barletta, Barbara)
October 21, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis - So Ordered by District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 10/21/2019. (Barletta, Barbara)
October 21, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed as Pro Se Electronic Filer- So Ordered by District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 10/21/2019. (Barletta, Barbara)
October 16, 2019 Notice of Availability to Receive Documents Electronically. Pro Se litigants are encouraged to review the details of the Consent & Registration Form and if interested, complete the Registration Form and return it to the Clerks Office. Click # here to access the form. (Potter, Carrie)
October 16, 2019 Filing 4 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Potter, Carrie)
October 16, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by David A. Silvia. (Potter, Carrie)
October 16, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed as Pro Se Electronic Filer filed by David A. Silvia. (Potter, Carrie)
October 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, filed by David A. Silvia. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Envelope)(Potter, Carrie)
October 16, 2019 CASE CONDITIONALLY ASSIGNED to District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. Related Case Number CA19-142-JJM-LDA based upon the indication on the cover sheet that a related case previously was assigned to the presiding judge. The assignment is subject to the presiding judge's determination that the cases, in fact, are related. (Potter, Carrie)
October 16, 2019 Notice of Availability to Receive Documents Electronically. Pro Se litigants are encouraged to review the details of the Consent & Registration Form and if interested, complete the Registration Form and return it to the Clerks Office. Click # here to access the form. (Potter, Carrie)
October 16, 2019 Filing 4 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Potter, Carrie)
October 16, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by David A. Silvia. (Potter, Carrie)
October 16, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed as Pro Se Electronic Filer filed by David A. Silvia. (Potter, Carrie)
October 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, filed by David A. Silvia. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Envelope)(Potter, Carrie)
October 16, 2019 CASE CONDITIONALLY ASSIGNED to District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. Related Case Number CA19-142-JJM-LDA based upon the indication on the cover sheet that a related case previously was assigned to the presiding judge. The assignment is subject to the presiding judge's determination that the cases, in fact, are related. (Potter, Carrie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Silvia v. Woonsocket Housing Authority et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David A. Silvia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Moreau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Woonsocket Housing Authority
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David M. aRusso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?