Jennifer F. v. Saul
Plaintiff: Jennifer Flaherty
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Interested Party: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 1:2019cv00547
Filed: October 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: Mary S McElroy
Referring Judge: Patricia A Sullivan
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 24, 2019 NOTICE to Parties of Right to Consent to U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Parties who elect to consent must complete the Consent to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form within 14 days. # Please click here to access the form . Consent to Assignment of Magistrate Judge due by 11/7/2019. (Simoncelli, Michael)
October 23, 2019 Filing 5 SOCIAL SECURITY CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED.The defendant shall have up to and including 12/23/2019 to enter an appearance and either file a dispositive motion or the Certified Administrative Record which shall be deemed an answer (general denial) to the plaintiff's complaint as outlined in Fed. R. Civ. P. 8(b)(3). (Simoncelli, Michael)
October 21, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis - So Ordered by District Judge Mary S. McElroy on 10/21/2019. (Urizandi, Nisshy)
October 17, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Rami M. Vanegas on behalf of Andrew Saul (Vanegas, Rami)
October 17, 2019 Case assigned to District Judge Mary S. McElroy and Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (Potter, Carrie)
October 17, 2019 Filing 2 First MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Jennifer Flaherty. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit In Forma Pauperis)(Spunzo, David)
October 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (No fee paid, USA, Waived by Statute, or IFP.), filed by Jennifer Flaherty. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Personal Identifier Form)(Spunzo, David)
October 17, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Rami M. Vanegas on behalf of Andrew Saul (Vanegas, Rami)
October 17, 2019 Case assigned to District Judge Mary S. McElroy and Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (Potter, Carrie)
October 17, 2019 Filing 2 First MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Jennifer Flaherty. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit In Forma Pauperis)(Spunzo, David)
October 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (No fee paid, USA, Waived by Statute, or IFP.), filed by Jennifer Flaherty. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Personal Identifier Form)(Spunzo, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jennifer F. v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Represented By: Rami M. Vanegas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Flaherty
Represented By: David F. Spunzo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?