Amanda L. v. Saul
Plaintiff: Amanda Laflamme
Defendant: Andrew M Saul
Interested Party: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 1:2019cv00571
Filed: October 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: Lincoln D Almond
Referring Judge: Mary S McElroy
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 19, 2019 Filing 8 Assented MOTION for an Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Andrew M Saul. Responses due by 1/2/2020. (Weilbrenner, Lucy)
November 14, 2019 Case reassigned to District Judge Mary S. McElroy and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond no longer assigned to the case as presider. (Saucier, Martha)
October 24, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Assignment of Case to Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. Within 14 days of receipt of this notice, parties must either consent or decline to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction by completing a Consent/Declination form. # Please click here to access the form . Consent to Assignment of Magistrate Judge due by 11/7/2019. Consent to Assignment of Magistrate Judge due by 11/7/2019. (Farrell Pletcher, Paula)
October 24, 2019 Filing 5 SOCIAL SECURITY CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED.# Personal Identifier Statement due 10/25/2019. (Farrell Pletcher, Paula)
October 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond on 10/24/2019. (Noel, Jeannine)
October 24, 2019 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Potter, Carrie)
October 24, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Lucy A. Weilbrenner on behalf of Andrew M Saul (Weilbrenner, Lucy)
October 24, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Amanda Laflamme. (Maguire, Stephen)
October 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (No fee paid, USA, Waived by Statute, or IFP.), filed by Amanda Laflamme. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons.Barr, #3 Summons.GenCounsel, #4 Summons.Saul, #5 Summons.Weisman)(Maguire, Stephen)
October 24, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Assignment of Case to Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. Within 14 days of receipt of this notice, parties must either consent or decline to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction by completing a Consent/Declination form. # Please click here to access the form . Consent to Assignment of Magistrate Judge due by 11/7/2019. Consent to Assignment of Magistrate Judge due by 11/7/2019. (Farrell Pletcher, Paula)
October 24, 2019 Filing 5 SOCIAL SECURITY CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED.# Personal Identifier Statement due 10/25/2019. (Farrell Pletcher, Paula)
October 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond on 10/24/2019. (Noel, Jeannine)
October 24, 2019 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Potter, Carrie)
October 24, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Lucy A. Weilbrenner on behalf of Andrew M Saul (Weilbrenner, Lucy)
October 24, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Amanda Laflamme. (Maguire, Stephen)
October 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (No fee paid, USA, Waived by Statute, or IFP.), filed by Amanda Laflamme. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons.Barr, #3 Summons.GenCounsel, #4 Summons.Saul, #5 Summons.Weisman)(Maguire, Stephen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Amanda L. v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amanda Laflamme
Represented By: Stephen P. Maguire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew M Saul
Represented By: Lucy A. Weilbrenner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?