Heden v. Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Keith D Heden
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Richard Sackler, Purdue Pharmaceuticals LLC, Mortimer David Alfons Sackler, The Sackler Family et al., David Sackler, Mallinckrodt PLC, McKesson, Alex Gorsky, Mark Trudeau, AmerisourceBergen, Johnson and Johnson, Cardinal Health, Craig Landau, Kare' Schultz and Russell Gasdia
Case Number: 1:2019cv00586
Filed: November 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: Lincoln D Almond
Referring Judge: William E Smith
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 11, 2019 Filing 11 Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-121) Transferring this matter to the Northern District of Ohio and assignment to the Honorable Dan A. Polster for coordinated and consolidated pretrial proceedings. So Ordered by John W. Nichols, Clerk of the Panel on 11/26/2019. (Jackson, Ryan)
December 2, 2019 MOTIONS REFERRED: #8 MOTION for Leave to Proceed as Pro Se Electronic Filer , #7 MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint, #5 First MOTION for an Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal - New Case, , #6 MOTION for Relief from Stay referred for determination to Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Jackson, Ryan)
November 20, 2019 Filing 10 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to all Defendants filed by Keith D Heden. (Attachments: #1 Acknowledgement of Service, #2 Acknowledgement of Service, #3 Acknowledgement of Service, #4 Acknowledgement of Service, #5 Acknowledgement of Service, #6 Acknowledgement of Service, #7 Acknowledgement of Service, #8 Acknowledgement of Service, #9 Acknowledgement of Service, #10 Acknowledgement of Service, #11 Acknowledgement of Service, #12 Acknowledgement of Service, #13 Acknowledgement of Service, #14 Acknowledgement of Service, #15 Acknowledgement of Service, #16 Envelope)(Hicks, Alyson)
November 12, 2019 Filing 9 STATE COURT RECORD received electronically from the State of Rhode Island. (Simoncelli, Michael)
November 12, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Proceed as Pro Se Electronic Filer filed by Keith D Heden. (Hicks, Alyson)
November 12, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint filed by Keith D Heden. Responses due by 11/26/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Amended Complaint)(Hicks, Alyson)
November 12, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Relief from Stay filed by Keith D Heden. Responses due by 11/26/2019. (Hicks, Alyson) (Main Document 6 replaced on 11/12/2019) (Hicks, Alyson).
November 12, 2019 Filing 5 First MOTION for an Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal - New Case, filed by Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.. Responses due by 11/26/2019. (Palmer, Gardner)
November 5, 2019 Filing 4 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Hicks, Alyson)
November 5, 2019 Case assigned to Chief Judge William E. Smith and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Hicks, Alyson)
November 5, 2019 Filing 3 Civil Cover Sheet filed by Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.. Regarding New Case: #1 Notice of Removal - New Case, . (Palmer, Gardner)
November 5, 2019 CORRECTIVE DOCKET ENTRY Regarding: #1 Notice of Removal - New Case. This case has been electronically filed and processed, however, after a quality control review the following deficiencies were found: Civil Cover Sheet not attached. The filer is directed to file a Civil Cover Sheet within one day. (Hicks, Alyson)
November 5, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. (Hicks, Alyson)
November 5, 2019 Filing 1 NEW CASE/NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Washington County Superior Court, Case Number WC-2019-0525. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0103-1439785, filed by Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Supplement 7.1 Statement)(Palmer, Gardner)
November 5, 2019 Filing 4 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Hicks, Alyson)
November 5, 2019 Case assigned to Chief Judge William E. Smith and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Hicks, Alyson)
November 5, 2019 Filing 3 Civil Cover Sheet filed by Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.. Regarding New Case: #1 Notice of Removal - New Case, . (Palmer, Gardner)
November 5, 2019 CORRECTIVE DOCKET ENTRY Regarding: #1 Notice of Removal - New Case. This case has been electronically filed and processed, however, after a quality control review the following deficiencies were found: Civil Cover Sheet not attached. The filer is directed to file a Civil Cover Sheet within one day. (Hicks, Alyson)
November 5, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. (Hicks, Alyson)
November 5, 2019 Filing 1 NEW CASE/NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Washington County Superior Court, Case Number WC-2019-0525. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0103-1439785, filed by Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Supplement 7.1 Statement)(Palmer, Gardner)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Heden v. Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Represented By: Gardner H. Palmer, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharmaceuticals LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortimer David Alfons Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Sackler Family et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alex Gorsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Trudeau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AmerisourceBergen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson and Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Craig Landau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kare' Schultz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Russell Gasdia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keith D Heden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?