Varga v. Davol, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Janos Varga
Defendant: Davol, Inc., Ethicon, Inc., C.R. Bard, Inc. and Johnson & Johnson
Case Number: 1:2019cv00588
Filed: November 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: William E Smith
Referring Judge: Patricia A Sullivan
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 11, 2019 Filing 7 Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-43): Transferring this matter to the Southern District of Ohio and assignment to the Honorable Edmund A. Sargus, Jr. for coordinated and consolidated pretrial proceedings. So Ordered by John W. Nichols, Clerk of the Panel on 12/3/2019. (Jackson, Ryan)
November 25, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Hicks, Alyson)
November 24, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Request filed by Janos Varga. (Delgado, Misty)
November 24, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Request filed by Janos Varga. (Delgado, Misty)
November 7, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to C.R. Bard, Inc., Davol, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Hicks, Alyson)
November 7, 2019 Filing 2 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Hicks, Alyson)
November 7, 2019 Case assigned to Chief Judge William E. Smith and Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (Hicks, Alyson)
November 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1441521 ), filed by Janos Varga. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(Delgado, Misty)
November 7, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to C.R. Bard, Inc., Davol, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Hicks, Alyson)
November 7, 2019 Filing 2 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Hicks, Alyson)
November 7, 2019 Case assigned to Chief Judge William E. Smith and Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (Hicks, Alyson)
November 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1441521 ), filed by Janos Varga. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(Delgado, Misty)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Varga v. Davol, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Davol, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ethicon, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C.R. Bard, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janos Varga
Represented By: Misty Delgado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?