Tortolani v. National Railroad Passenger Corp.
Plaintiff: Richard Tortolani
Defendant: National Railroad Passenger Corp.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00592
Filed: November 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: Mary S McElroy
Referring Judge: Patricia A Sullivan
Nature of Suit: Federal Employer's Liability
Cause of Action: 45:51
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 10, 2020 Filing 14 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Sage, Jennifer)
January 7, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #13 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Christopher Naumes. So Ordered by District Judge Mary S. McElroy on 1/7/2020. (Hicks, Alyson)
January 7, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION for Christopher C. Naumes to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 100.00, receipt number 0103-1462289 ) filed by Richard Tortolani. (Greene, Vincent)
January 6, 2020 Filing 12 RULE 16 STATEMENT by Richard Tortolani. (Naumes, Robert)
January 6, 2020 Filing 11 RULE 16 STATEMENT by National Railroad Passenger Corp.. (Sage, Jennifer)
December 12, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Hearing: Rule 16 Conference set for 1/13/2020 at 10:00 AM in Judge McElroy's Chambers before District Judge Mary S. McElroy. (Urizandi, Nisshy)
December 4, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Robert T. Naumes filed by Richard Tortolani. - So Ordered by District Judge Mary S. McElroy on 12/4/2019. (McGuire, Vickie)
December 4, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Robert T. Naumes, Sr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 100.00, receipt number 0103-1452955 ) filed by Richard Tortolani. (Greene, Vincent)
December 3, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint by National Railroad Passenger Corp..(Sage, Jennifer)
December 3, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer Lee Sage on behalf of National Railroad Passenger Corp. (Sage, Jennifer)
December 3, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer Lee Sage on behalf of National Railroad Passenger Corp. (Sage, Jennifer)
December 3, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of John J. Bonistalli; granting #5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Jennifer Lee Sage. So Ordered by District Judge Mary S. McElroy on 12/3/2019. (Potter, Carrie)
December 3, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Jennifer Lee Sage to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 100.00, receipt number 0103-1452593 ) filed by National Railroad Passenger Corp.. (Dunn, Mary)
December 3, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for John J. Bonistalli to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 100.00, receipt number 0103-1452588 ) filed by National Railroad Passenger Corp.. (Dunn, Mary)
November 13, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to National Railroad Passenger Corp.. (Hicks, Alyson)
November 13, 2019 Filing 2 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Hicks, Alyson)
November 13, 2019 Case assigned to District Judge Mary S. McElroy and Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (Hicks, Alyson)
November 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1444418 ), filed by Richard Tortolani. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Summons)(Greene, Vincent)
November 13, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to National Railroad Passenger Corp.. (Hicks, Alyson)
November 13, 2019 Filing 2 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Hicks, Alyson)
November 13, 2019 Case assigned to District Judge Mary S. McElroy and Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (Hicks, Alyson)
November 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1444418 ), filed by Richard Tortolani. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Summons)(Greene, Vincent)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tortolani v. National Railroad Passenger Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Tortolani
Represented By: Vincent L. Greene, IV
Represented By: Christopher Naumes
Represented By: Robert T. Naumes, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Railroad Passenger Corp.
Represented By: Mary C. Dunn
Represented By: Jennifer Lee Sage
Represented By: John J. Bonistalli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?